EP1058624 - TOWING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kalabis-Belá Lidová 783 294 21 Belá pod Bezdezem / CZ | [2000/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POL C EK, Ladislav Rubinova 1923 511 01 Turnov / CZ | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Jeck, Anton Jeck, Fleck & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Jeck, Anton Jeck - Fleck - Herrmann Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | ||
Former [2000/50] | Jeck, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | Application number, filing date | 99906024.7 | 05.03.1999 | [2000/50] | WO1999CZ00006 | Priority number, date | CZ19980007740U | 05.03.1998 Original published format: CZ 774098 U | CZ19980003904 | 27.11.1998 Original published format: CZ 390498 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9944844 | Date: | 10.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1058624 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60D1/52 | [2000/50] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2000/50] | Title | German: | ANHÄNGEVORRICHTUNG | [2000/50] | English: | TOWING DEVICE | [2000/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REMORQUAGE | [2000/50] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 21.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/42] | 08.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0700799 (TOBO BV [NL]) [A] 1 * figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP0492035 (ORIS METALLBAU KG RIEHLE H [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-6 *; | [AD]CH675859 (ORIS METALLBAU KG RIEHLE H) [AD] 1 * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | FR2697471 | FR2647394 | WO9704972 |