EP1012471 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2000/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Martin Friedrichstrasse 24 D-71696 Möglingen / DE | 02 /
DANTES, Günter Karlstrasse 20 D-71735 Eberdingen / DE | 03 /
HEYSE, Jörg Eichenweg 15 D-71706 Markgröningen / DE | [2000/26] | Application number, filing date | 99906047.8 | 14.01.1999 | [2000/26] | WO1999DE00049 | Priority number, date | DE1998115781 | 08.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19815781 | [2000/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9953192 | Date: | 21.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1012471 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1012471 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F02M61/18 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
F02M61/1853 (EP,US);
F02M61/162 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/26] | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL | [2000/26] | English: | FUEL INJECTION VALVE | [2000/26] | French: | SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT | [2000/26] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 10.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 14.01.2004 | FR | 31.01.2004 | [2008/43] |
Former [2005/01] | GB | 14.01.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4040396 (TOMITA HITOSHI) [A] 1-6,10* column 2, line 10 - line 55; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE19607277 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,3 * column 4, line 3 - column 5, line 61; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | DE3943005 | WO9611335 | DE19607288 |