blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0979387

EP0979387 - NAVIGATION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR POSITION DETERMINATION BY MEANS OF COUPLED NAVIGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.01.2006
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.01.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.03.2006  [2006/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHUPFNER, Markus
Simadergasse 4
D-93047 Regensburg / DE
[2000/07]
Application number, filing date99906064.321.01.1999
[2000/07]
WO1999DE00153
Priority number, dateDE199810366230.01.1998         Original published format: DE 19803662
[2000/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9939161
Date:05.08.1999
Language:DE
[1999/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979387
Date:16.02.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979387
Date:23.03.2005
Language:DE
[2005/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.08.1999
ClassificationIPC:G01C21/20, G01C25/00
[2000/07]
CPC:
G01C21/30 (EP,US); G01C25/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/07]
TitleGerman:NAVIGATIONSGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR POSITIONSBESTIMMUNG MITTELS KOPPELNAVIGATION[2000/07]
English:NAVIGATION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR POSITION DETERMINATION BY MEANS OF COUPLED NAVIGATION[2000/07]
French:APPAREIL DE NAVIGATION ET PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION DE POSITION PAR NAVIGATION COUPLEE[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase17.09.1999National basic fee paid 
17.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
17.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
18.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.2004Fee for grant paid
20.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
19.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0261404  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,4 * column 6, line 21 - column 7, line 50 *;
 [A]US5159556  (SCHORTER MICHEL [FR]) [A] 1,4* abstract *;
 [A]US5311195  (MATHIS DARRELL L [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * abstract * * column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.