blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0975858

EP0975858 - TWO-STROKE INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH AN ADDITIONAL ENGINE-OIL LUBRICATING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.08.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.10.2003  [2003/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dolmar GmbH
Jenfelder Strasse 38
22045 Hamburg / DE
[2000/05]
Inventor(s)01 / SINGER, Andreas
Werdauer Strasse 22
D-08427 Fraureuth / DE
02 / SCHÖNHAAR, Jochen
Lottestrasse 41
D-22529 Hamburg / DE
03 / BRAUER, Steffen
Lindenstrasse 28
D-08124 Cainsdorf / DE
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Gerbaulet, Hannes
RGTH
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Neuer Wall 10
20354 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Gerbaulet, Hannes
Patentanwälte Richter, Werdermann & Gerbaulet Neuer Wall 10
20354 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date99906106.207.01.1999
[2000/05]
WO1999EP00050
Priority number, dateDE199810078812.01.1998         Original published format: DE 19800788
[2000/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9935377
Date:15.07.1999
Language:DE
[1999/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975858
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0975858
Date:16.10.2002
Language:DE
[2002/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.07.1999
ClassificationIPC:F01M11/10
[2000/05]
CPC:
F01M11/10 (EP,US); F01M2011/0491 (EP,US); F02B2075/025 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   IT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:ZWEI-TAKT-BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE MIT ZUSÄTZLICHEM MOTORÖLSCHMIERSYSTEM[2000/05]
English:TWO-STROKE INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH AN ADDITIONAL ENGINE-OIL LUBRICATING SYSTEM[2000/05]
French:MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE A DEUX TEMPS POURVU D'UN SYSTEME SUPPLEMENTAIRE DE LUBRIFICATION PAR HUILE MOTEUR[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase03.09.1999National basic fee paid 
03.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
04.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2002Fee for grant paid
20.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]JPS5871219  ;
 [A]GB1164087  (HERR MFG CO INC [US]) [A] 1* figure - *;
 [A]US4535910  (NAGASHIMA AKIRA [JP]) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830720), vol. 007, no. 165, Database accession no. (M - 230), & JP58071219 A 19830427 (HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.