blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0972342

EP0972342 - CIRCUIT FOR DRIVING A SWITCHING TRANSISTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.09.2005
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DEUTSCHE THOMSON-BRANDT GMBH
Hermann-Schwer-Strasse 3
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / LOUVEL, Jean-Paul
Roggenbachstrasse 5
D-78050 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
02 / MEITZNER, Michael
Tiroler Strasse 31/33
D-78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Rossmanith, Manfred, et al
Deutsche Thomson OHG
Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D
30625 Hannover / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/39]Rossmanith, Manfred, et al
Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74
30625 Hannover / DE
Former [2000/03]Rossmanith, Manfred, Dr., et al
Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, Licensing & Intellectual Property, Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74
30625 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date99906175.720.01.1999
[2000/03]
WO1999EP00360
Priority number, dateDE199810327029.01.1998         Original published format: DE 19803270
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9939435
Date:05.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972342
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972342
Date:10.11.2004
Language:EN
[2004/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.08.1999
ClassificationIPC:H03K17/0422, H03K17/60
[2000/03]
CPC:
H03K17/0422 (EP); H03K17/601 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/03]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINES SCHALTTRANSISTORS[2000/03]
English:CIRCUIT FOR DRIVING A SWITCHING TRANSISTOR[2000/03]
French:CIRCUIT POUR COMMANDER UN TRANSISTOR DE COMMUTATION[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase24.09.1999National basic fee paid 
24.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
24.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
23.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.09.2004Fee for grant paid
08.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.08.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
21.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0504559  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document * * figures 11,12 *;
 [X]US4755741  (NELSON CARL T [US]) [X] 1-8 * figure 5 * * elements 574, 576, 578 and 580. *;
 [X]US4987362  (ZWANZIGER PETER [DE]) [X] 1-4,7 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4713561  (YAMADA KAZUYOSHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-7 * figures 4,5 *;
 [X]EP0114540  (TELEMECANIQUE ELECTRIQUE [FR]) [X] 1-4,7,10 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.