EP1060356 - GRATE PLATE FOR COOLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAGOTTEAUX INTERNATIONAL Rue A. Dumont B-4051 Vaux-Sous-Chevremont / BE | [2000/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIRARD, Regnier 208, rue Large B-4870 Nessonvaux / BE | 02 /
WOLAN, Bruno 91, rue du Bouny B-4624 Fleron / BE | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | Meyers, Ernest, et al pronovem - MEYERS & VAN MALDEREN 261 route d'Arlon 8011 Strassen / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | Meyers, Ernest, et al Office de Brevets Meyers & Van Malderen 261 route d'Arlon B.P. 111 8002 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 99906231.8 | 09.02.1999 | [2000/51] | WO1999EP00935 | Priority number, date | BE19980000143 | 24.02.1998 Original published format: BE 9800143 | [2000/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9944001 | Date: | 02.09.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1060356 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1060356 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F27D15/02 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
F27D15/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, PT [2000/51] | Title | German: | KÜHLERROSTPLATTE | [2000/51] | English: | GRATE PLATE FOR COOLER | [2000/51] | French: | PLAQUE DE GRILLE POUR REFROIDISSEUR | [2000/51] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/51] | 28.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3332592 (WEDEL KARL VON DIPL ING DIPL W); | [A]EP0489369 (ZEMENTANLAGEN UND MASCHINENBAU [DE]) [A] 1,3,4 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]DE4103866 (ZEMENTANLAGEN UND MASCHINENBAU [DE]) [X] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE19537904 (KRUPP POLYSIUS AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,5 * figure -; claim - * |