EP1061883 - LIQUID DISTRIBUTION MATERIALS WITH IMPROVED DISTRIBUTION PROPERTIES UNDER SUB-SATURATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2005 | Deletion: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESAI, Fred 6383 Jamesfield Court Fairfield, OH 45014 / US | 02 /
DESMARAIS, Thomas, Allen 10204 Scull Road Cincinnati, OH 45252 / US | 03 /
EHRNSPERGER, Bruno, Johannes Westerbachstrasse 89 D-65936 Frankfurt / DE | 04 /
SCHMIDT, Mattias Altkoenigweg 3 D-65510 Idstein / DE | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Uwe T., et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 99906380.3 | 12.03.1999 | [2000/52] | WO1999IB00409 | Priority number, date | WO1998US05041 | 13.03.1998 Original published format: PCT/US98/05041 | [2000/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9947092 | Date: | 23.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1061883 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
A61F13/5376 (EP);
A61L15/00 (KR);
A61F13/15203 (EP);
A61F13/537 (EP);
A61F2013/15463 (EP);
A61F2013/1552 (EP);
A61F2013/15552 (EP);
A61F2013/530459 (EP);
A61F2013/530467 (EP);
A61F2013/530817 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/52] | Title | German: | ABSORBIERENDE ARTIKEL MIT VERBESSERTEN VERTEILUNGSEIGENSCHAFTEN BEI UNTERSÄTTIGUNG | [2000/52] | English: | LIQUID DISTRIBUTION MATERIALS WITH IMPROVED DISTRIBUTION PROPERTIES UNDER SUB-SATURATION | [2000/52] | French: | MATERIAUX DE DISTRIBUTION DE LIQUIDES POSSEDANT DES PROPRIETES DE DISTRIBUTION AMELIOREES EN ETAT DE SATURATION PARTIELLE | [2000/52] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 15.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5147345 (YOUNG GERALD A [US], et al) [A] 1,29-31,34,35,37-48 * column 3, line 48 - line 52; figures 3-6; claim - *; | [A]GB2296511 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1-14,17-25 * claims 1,12-15,20,21 *; | [A]WO9723184 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1,14-16* abstract *; | [A]WO9734558 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,30-36 * figure -; claim - *; | [AD]EP0809991 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [AD] 1,14-16 * claim - * | by applicant | US3952745 | US4578068 | EP0343941 | US4898642 | EP0397110 | EP0640330 |