EP1060748 - REMEDIES FOR CORNEAL EPITHELIUM DISTURBANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wakamoto Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 5-3, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8330 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states Wakamoto Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 5-3, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8330 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Ryoki B703, Hadano-Manshon 2044, Minamiyana Hadano-shi Kanagawa 257-0003 / JP | 02 /
NOGUCHI, Takayasu 280-301, Kanade Oimachi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-0018 / JP | 03 /
AKIBA, Kiyoshi 2018-2-602, Mukohara Yamakitamachi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-0111 / JP | 04 /
OMURA, Takeo 974-16, Kaneko, Oimachi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-0019 / JP | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/51] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Dietmar Forstmeyer, Bereiteranger 15 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99906472.8 | 25.02.1999 | [2000/51] | WO1999JP00853 | Priority number, date | JP19980059063 | 25.02.1998 Original published format: JP 5906398 | JP19980141500 | 22.05.1998 Original published format: JP 14150098 | JP19980184801 | 30.06.1998 Original published format: JP 18480198 | JP19980288063 | 09.10.1998 Original published format: JP 28806398 | [2000/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9943347 | Date: | 02.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1060748 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.09.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/57, A61P27/02 | [2002/36] | CPC: |
A61K38/57 (EP,KR);
A61P27/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/51] | A61K38/57 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/51] | Title | German: | MEDIKAMENTE FÜR CORNEAEPITHELSTÖRUNGEN | [2000/51] | English: | REMEDIES FOR CORNEAL EPITHELIUM DISTURBANCE | [2000/51] | French: | MEDICAMENTS DESTINES AUX TROUBLES DE L'EPITHELIUM CORNEEN | [2000/51] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2000 | Translation filed | 31.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2000 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 31.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/51] | 18.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/40] | 02.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - OHNISHI H ET AL, "PHARMACOLOGICAL ACTIVITIES OF A TRYPSIN INHIBITOR, URINASTATIN (MIRACLID )", OYO YAKURI - PHARMACOMETRICS, XX, XX, (1986), vol. 31, no. 3, ISSN 0300-8533, pages 663 - 675, XP000881560 [X] 1-5 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS63267730 (KOSUGI TADAMASA); | [A]EP0223254 (LABSYSTEMS OY [FI]) |