EP1061099 - POLYPROPYLENE RESIN COMPOSITIONS AND PACKAGING STRETCHED FILM MADE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUREHA CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 9-11, Nihonbashi, Horidome-cho, 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0012 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states Kureha Chemical Industry Co., Ltd. 9-11, Nihonbashi, Horidome-cho, 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAJIMA, Junji 3452-41, Kandatsu-machi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | 02 /
FUNABASHI, Shinichiro 16-3, Inayoshi 5-chome Chiyoda-machi Niihari-gun Ibaraki 315-0054 / JP | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | Benson, John Everett J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | Benson, John Everett J. A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 99906529.5 | 26.02.1999 | [2000/51] | WO1999JP00953 | Priority number, date | JP19980066224 | 02.03.1998 Original published format: JP 6622498 | [2000/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9945064 | Date: | 10.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1061099 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.09.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/10, C08J5/18, B32B27/32 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
B32B27/32 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/12 (EP,KR);
B29C55/12 (KR);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/302 (US);
C08J5/18 (EP,KR);
C08L23/10 (EP);
C08L23/14 (EP);
C08L23/22 (EP,KR);
C08L53/02 (EP,KR);
C08L53/025 (EP);
B32B2038/0028 (US);
B32B2307/518 (US);
B32B2323/10 (US);
B32B2439/70 (US);
C08J2323/10 (EP);
C08J2323/12 (EP);
C08J2423/20 (EP);
C08J2453/02 (EP);
C08L2203/16 (KR);
C08L2205/02 (EP,KR);
C08L2205/03 (EP,KR);
C08L23/20 (EP);
C08L25/10 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/10, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L23/10, C08L2666/24 (EP);
C08L23/12, C08L2666/04 (EP);
C08L23/14, C08L2666/02 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/51] | Title | German: | POLYPROPYLENHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTER GESTRECKTER VERPACKUNGSFILM | [2000/51] | English: | POLYPROPYLENE RESIN COMPOSITIONS AND PACKAGING STRETCHED FILM MADE THEREOF | [2000/51] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE RESINE POLYPROPYLENE ET FILM D'EMBALLAGE ETIRE FABRIQUE AVEC CETTE RESINE | [2000/51] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2000 | Translation filed | 04.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2000 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 04.09.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/51] | 05.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/24] | 13.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5569693 (DOSHI ANIL G [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 2, line 47 - column 2, line 59 * | International search | [A]JPH073089 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH04270745 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO); | [A]JPS6243443 (TOYODA GOSEI KK); | [A]JPH06322194 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD) |