EP1053098 - STRUCTURE HAVING AT LEAST ONE IMPROVED SURFACE AND A METHOD OF MAKING THE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Steelewood Extruding Corporation 1171 W. Sample Road Coral Springs, FL 33075 / US | [2000/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIERSON, Richard, E. 12456 N.W. 19th Place Coral Springs, FL 33071 / US | 02 /
EVANS, Robert, M. 10044 N.W. Second Street Coral Springs, FL 33071 / US | [2000/47] | Representative(s) | Grey, Ian Michael, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/47] | Grey, Ian Michael, et al Venner, Shipley & Co, 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99906858.8 | 10.02.1999 | [2000/47] | WO1999US02824 | Priority number, date | US19980021775 | 11.02.1998 Original published format: US 21775 | [2000/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9941072 | Date: | 19.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1053098 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/12, E06B9/386 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
E06B9/36 (EP,US);
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24355 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24612 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24901 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24983 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, NL [2000/47] | Title | German: | STRUKTUR MIT WENIGSTENS EINER VERBESSERTEN OBERFLÄCHE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2000/47] | English: | STRUCTURE HAVING AT LEAST ONE IMPROVED SURFACE AND A METHOD OF MAKING THE STRUCTURE | [2000/47] | French: | STRUCTURE PRESENTANT AU MOINS UNE SURFACE AMELIOREE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CETTE STRUCTURE | [2000/47] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 31.07.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/10] | 06.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4877077 (EBERT GEORGE W [US]) [A] 1,6,8-13,18-20,33,38-46,51-54 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5102598 (CHEN CHANG-THAN [TW]) [A] 21,28,29,55,62,63,67 * abstract *; | [A]US5194209 (SCHWAEGERLE PAUL R [US]) [A] 1,6,8-13,18-20,33,38-46,51-54 * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 19; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5447758 (PELLETIER ANDREE [CA]) [A] 21,22,24,28,29,55,56,58,62,63,67 * abstract *; | [PA]US5832979 (MARUSAK THOMAS J [US]) [PA] 1,10,11,33,42,43 * column 5, paragraph 1 ** column 8, paragraph 1 * |