blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0973922

EP0973922 - STRAWBERRY FRUIT PROMOTERS FOR GENE EXPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.01.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip09.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.02.2004  [2004/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Calgene LLC
1920 Fifth Street
Davis, CA 95616 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Calgene LLC
1920 Fifth Street
Davis, California 95616 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WILKINSON, Jack, Q.
4447 Cowell Boulevard 38
Davis, CA 95616 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al
Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date99906920.604.02.1999
[2000/04]
WO1999US02958
Priority number, dateUS1998002003306.02.1998         Original published format: US 20033
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO9940211
Date:12.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0973922
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.09.1999
ClassificationIPC:C12N15/82, C12N15/29, A01H5/00
[2000/04]
CPC:
C07K14/415 (EP,US); C12N15/8235 (EP,US); C12N15/8245 (EP,US);
C12N15/8249 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:FRUCHT SPEZIFISCHE PROMOTORE AUS ERDBEEREN ZUR GENEXPRESSION[2000/04]
English:STRAWBERRY FRUIT PROMOTERS FOR GENE EXPRESSION[2000/04]
French:PROMOTEURS DE FRAISES SERVANT A L'EXPRESSION GENETIQUE[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase02.11.1999National basic fee paid 
02.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
02.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
27.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/09]
15.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO9727308  (AGRITOPE INC [US], et al) [X] 1,12-21 * abstract * * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 23 * * page 10, line 18 - page 18, line 11 * [Y] 2-5,8-10;
 [PX]WO9831812  (MONSANTO CO [US]) [PX] 1,12-21 * page 2, line 17 - page 3, line 7; examples 1-4; claims 9-20 * * page 5, line 15 - page 20, line 27 *
 [DY]  - WILKINSON J Q ET AL, "IDENTIFICATION OF MRNAS WITH ENHANCED EXPRESSION IN RIPENING STRAWBERRY FRUIT USING POLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION DIFFERENTIAL DISPLAY", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (19950301), vol. 27, no. 6, ISSN 0167-4412, pages 1097 - 1108, XP000670213 [DY] 2-5 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00020883
 [DXY]  - REDDY A S N AND POOVAIAH B W, "Molecular cloning and sequencing of a cDNA for an auxin-repressed mRNA: correlation between fruit growth and repression of the auxin-regulated gene", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (199002), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 127 - 136, XP002110637 [DX] 6,7,11 * the whole document * [Y] 8-10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00018554
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.