EP1102551 - IMPROVEMENTS IN VENTILATED GARMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VANSON LEATHERS, INC. 951 Broadway Fall River, MA 02074 / US | [2001/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DER SLEESEN, Michael, F. 8 North Main Street, No. 106 West Hartford, CT 06107 / US | [2001/22] | Representative(s) | Postiglione, Ferruccio, et al Gregorj S.r.l. Intellectual Property Via L. Muratori, 13 b 20135 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | Postiglione, Ferruccio, et al Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Ing. C. Gregorj S.p.A. Via L. Muratori 13/b 20135 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2001/22] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 99907151.7 | 19.02.1999 | [2001/22] | WO1999US03618 | Priority number, date | US19980075397P | 20.02.1998 Original published format: US 75397 P | [2001/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9942010 | Date: | 26.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1102551 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.08.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A41D1/02 | [2001/22] | CPC: |
A41D15/04 (EP,US);
A41D27/20 (EP,US);
A41D27/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/22] | Title | German: | BELÜFTETE BEKLEIDUNG | [2001/22] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS IN VENTILATED GARMENTS | [2001/22] | French: | AMELIORATIONS RELATIVES AUX VETEMENTS VENTILES | [2001/22] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2000 | Search fee paid | 20.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 14.01.2008 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 08.09.2008 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 31.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/35] | 13.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/35] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to provide information on prior art | 08.09.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 08.09.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.09.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   20.08.2004 | 28.02.2005 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   17.08.2005 | 28.02.2006 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   22.08.2006 | 28.02.2007 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2007 | 28.02.2010 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2392616 (HOLLANDIA KIEVIT BV [NL]) [A] 1-6* figures 1-3; claims 1,3,6-8,10,11 * | International search | [X]US2715226 (WEINER LOUIS I); | [A]US4185327 (MARKVE HOWARD J [US]); | [A]US4513451 (BROWN MICHAEL A [US]); | [A]US4608715 (MILLER RICHARD D [US], et al); | [A]US4722099 (KRATZ RICHARD F [US]); | [A]US5507042 (VAN DER SLEESEN MICHAEL F [US]); | [A]US5704064 (VAN DER SLEESEN MICHAEL F [US]) |