EP1064230 - USE OF TETRAPHENYLBORATE FOR EXTRACTION OF AMMONIUM IONS AND AMINES FROM WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DALHOUSIE UNIVERSITY Arts and Administration Building, Office of the President, 6299 South Street Halifax Nova Scotia B3H 4H6 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states DALHOUSIE UNIVERSITY Arts and Administration Building, Office of the President, 6299 South Street Halifax, Nova Scotia B3H 4H6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAMERON, T., Stanley 43 Albion Road Halifax, Nova Scotia B3P 1P8 / CA | 02 /
KNOP, Osvald 1054 Robie Street Halifax, Nova Scotia B3H 3C5 / CA | 03 /
CAMERON, Neil, S. 3452 Coloniale Avenue Montreal, Quebec H2X 2Y4 / CA | 04 /
CAMERON, Elinor, M. 43 Albion Road Halifax, Nova Scotia B3P 1P8 / CA | 05 /
BROWN, G., Ronald 2619 Parent Road Prince George, British Columbia V2N 5G3 / CA | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99907212.7 | 16.03.1999 | [2001/01] | WO1999CA00210 | Priority number, date | US19980078046P | 16.03.1998 Original published format: US 78046 P | [2001/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9947457 | Date: | 23.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1064230 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1064230 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/54 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
C02F1/683 (EP,US);
B01J39/04 (EP,US);
C02F1/42 (EP,US);
C02F1/54 (EP,US);
C02F1/586 (EP,US);
C02F1/285 (EP,US);
C02F2101/16 (EP,US);
C02F2101/38 (EP,US);
Y10S210/903 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1334 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2998 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2001/01] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON TETRAPHENYLBORAT ZUM EXTRAHIEREN VON AMMONIUMIONEN UND AMINEN AUS WASSER | [2001/01] | English: | USE OF TETRAPHENYLBORATE FOR EXTRACTION OF AMMONIUM IONS AND AMINES FROM WATER | [2001/01] | French: | UTILISATION DE TETRAPHENYLBORATE POUR EXTRAIRE DES IONS AMMONIUM ET DES AMINES D'EAU | [2001/01] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 05.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.05.2003 | BE | 28.05.2003 | CH | 28.05.2003 | FI | 28.05.2003 | FR | 28.05.2003 | IT | 28.05.2003 | LI | 28.05.2003 | NL | 28.05.2003 | DK | 28.08.2003 | SE | 28.08.2003 | ES | 08.09.2003 | [2008/17] |
Former [2006/32] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
BE | 28.05.2003 | ||
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
FR | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
BE | 28.05.2003 | ||
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
DE | 29.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
DE | 29.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 28.05.2003 | |
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 28.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0327796 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [A] * claims 1-12 * | Examination | US4695387 | EP0490385 | US5666641 |