EP1050058 - VACUUM INTERRUPTER CHAMBER WITH A RING-SHAPED ISOLATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.2002 [2002/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUSSEROW, Jörg Grüner Bogen 6 D-15366 Neuenhagen / DE | 02 /
RENZ, Roman, Dr. Neuhofer Strasse 78 D-12355 Berlin / DE | 03 /
FIEBERG, Klemens Attendorner Weg 39 D-13507 Berlin / DE | [2000/45] | Application number, filing date | 99907276.2 | 15.01.1999 | [2000/45] | WO1999DE00177 | Priority number, date | DE1998102893 | 21.01.1998 Original published format: DE 19802893 | [2000/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9938181 | Date: | 29.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1050058 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1050058 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01H33/66 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
H01H33/66207 (EP,US);
H01H2033/6613 (EP,US);
H01H33/66238 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2000/45] | Title | German: | VAKUUMSCHALTKAMMER MIT RINGFÖRMIGEM ISOLATOR | [2000/45] | English: | VACUUM INTERRUPTER CHAMBER WITH A RING-SHAPED ISOLATOR | [2000/45] | French: | CHAMBRE D'INTERRUPTEUR A VIDE A ISOLATEUR ANNULAIRE | [2000/45] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 16.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3026394 (EMMETT JENNINGS JO); | [A]DE2700761 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1 * page 4, paragraph L; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0200465 (VACUUM INTERRUPTERS [GB]) [A] 1,2 * page 3, paragraph L; figure 1 *; | [DA]US4672156 (BASNETT ROBERT T [US]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]DE19510850 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract * | Examination | DE2944286 | US4553007 | WO9119308 | DE4422316 |