EP1053119 - DOOR INNER ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carcoustics Tech Center GmbH Neuenkamp 8 51381 Leverkusen / DE | [2003/14] |
Former [2000/47] | For all designated states Illbruck Automotive International GmbH Neuenkamp 8 51381 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRÜCK, Eduard Hütte 1 D-51381 Leverkusen / DE | [2000/47] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | Cohausz & Florack Postfach 33 02 29 40435 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2002/48] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2000/47] | Müller, Enno, Dipl.-Ing., et al Rieder & Partner Anwaltskanzlei Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 99907502.1 | 05.02.1999 | [2000/47] | WO1999EP00750 | Priority number, date | DE19981004781 | 06.02.1998 Original published format: DE 19804781 | [2000/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9939931 | Date: | 12.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1053119 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1053119 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60J5/04, B60R13/02 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
B60J5/0416 (EP);
B60J5/04 (KR);
B60R13/0243 (EP);
B60R13/06 (EP);
B60R11/0217 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2004/02] |
Former [2000/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | ||
Former [2000/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | 22.07.2000 | LT | 22.07.2000 | LV | 22.07.2000 | MK | 22.07.2000 | RO | 22.07.2000 | SI | 22.07.2000 | Title | German: | TÜRINNENELEMENT | [2000/47] | English: | DOOR INNER ELEMENT | [2000/47] | French: | ELEMENT INTERIEUR DE PORTIERE | [2000/47] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 29.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) IE, MC | 23.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.10.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 16.06.2004 | NL | 16.06.2004 | DK | 16.09.2004 | GR | 16.09.2004 | SE | 16.09.2004 | CY | 05.02.2005 | LU | 05.02.2005 | CH | 28.02.2005 | LI | 28.02.2005 | [2007/22] |
Former [2006/47] | FI | 16.06.2004 | |
NL | 16.06.2004 | ||
DK | 16.09.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 16.06.2004 | |
DK | 16.09.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 16.06.2004 | |
DK | 16.09.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 16.06.2004 | |
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 16.06.2004 | |
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 16.09.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2201629 (UNITED CARR GMBH TRW) [A] 17-22* figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0425240 (BRIDGESTONE AUSTRALIA [AU]) [A] 12-22 * figures 1A,1B *; | [A]DE4444406 (BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 40-43; figures 1-2B *; | [A]WO9728977 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES AUTOMOTIVE [US]) [A] 1-22 * figures 1-10 *; | [X]DE19620148 (SOMMER ALLIBERT LIGNOTOCK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,7,11 * column 4, lines 34-43; figures 1-4 *; | [X]EP0811516 (BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE [DE]) [X] 1-4,7,11 * column 4, lines 38-44; figures 1-3 * |