EP1051324 - CLAMPING GRIP, ESPECIALLY FOR HANDLEBARS OF BICYCLES AND THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grätz, Michael Georg-Haindl-Strasse 24a 87448 Waltenhofen / DE | For all designated states KLIEBER, Jochen Dammweg 1 D-83342 Tacherting / DE | [2000/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | Wallinger, Michael Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Wallinger, Michael Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Foerstl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/46] | Wallinger, Michael, Dr.-Ing. Wallinger & Partner, Patentanwälte, Zweibrückenstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99907504.7 | 05.02.1999 | [2000/46] | WO1999EP00760 | Priority number, date | DE1998201916U | 05.02.1998 Original published format: DE 29801916 U | [2000/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9939970 | Date: | 12.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1051324 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1051324 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B62K21/26, B62K21/12, A63C11/22 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
B62K21/26 (EP,US);
A63B60/14 (EP,US);
A63B60/16 (EP,US);
Y10S16/12 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/46] | Title | German: | KLEMMGRIFF, INSBESONDERE FÜR LENKSTANGEN VON FAHRRÄDERN UND DERGLEICHEN | [2000/46] | English: | CLAMPING GRIP, ESPECIALLY FOR HANDLEBARS OF BICYCLES AND THE LIKE | [2000/46] | French: | POIGNEE DE PREHENSION, NOTAMMENT POUR GUIDONS DE BICYCLETTES ET SIMILAIRE | [2000/46] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 20.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 28.04.2004 | GB | 28.04.2004 | IT | 28.04.2004 | NL | 28.04.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 28.04.2004 | |
GB | 28.04.2004 | ||
NL | 28.04.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | GB | 28.04.2004 | |
NL | 28.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | GB | 28.04.2004 | Cited in | International search | [XY]FR394412 (EUGENE DENIS GIRARD [FR]) [X] 1-9,14-20 * column W * [Y] 10-13; | [X]FR13763E (EUGENE DENIS GIRARD [FR]) [X] 1-9,14-20 * column W *; | [Y]FR2695901 (BARBOTEAU JEAN GUY [FR], et al) [Y] 10,12,13 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR2704198 (DUCRET PATRICIA [FR]) [Y] 11* the whole document * |