EP1064262 - SUBSTITUTED ISOINDOLONES AND THEIR USE AS CYCLIC GMP MODULATORS IN MEDICAMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pharma Deutschland GmbH 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2001/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHINDLER, Ursula Robert-Stolz-Strasse 56 D-65812 Bad Soden / DE | 02 /
SCHÖNAFINGER, Karl Holunderweg 8 D-63755 Alzenau / DE | 03 /
STROBEL, Hartmut Erlenweg 22 D-65835 Liederbach / DE | 04 /
GROEHN, Viola Hardstrasse 10 CH-8212 Neuhausen / CH | [2001/01] | Application number, filing date | 99907548.4 | 12.02.1999 | [2001/01] | WO1999EP00931 | Priority number, date | DE1998107423 | 21.02.1998 Original published format: DE 19807423 | [2001/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9942444 | Date: | 26.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1064262 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1064262 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/48, A61K31/40, C07D401/04, C07D409/04 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
C07D209/48 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/02 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2001/01] | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE ISOINDOLONE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS CYCLISCHE GMP MODULATOREN IN ARZNEIMITTELN | [2001/01] | English: | SUBSTITUTED ISOINDOLONES AND THEIR USE AS CYCLIC GMP MODULATORS IN MEDICAMENTS | [2001/01] | French: | ISOINDOLONES SUBSTITUEES ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME MODULATEURS DU GMP CYCLIQUE | [2001/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 18.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0667345 (YUNG SHIN PHARM IND CO LTD [TW]) [DA] 1,12 * page 3 *; | [A]EP0743304 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,12* claims 1,9 * |