EP1059972 - PARLOUR GAME SET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2002 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2002 [2002/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Walk on the Strip (Wots) N.V. 14 John B. Gorstraweg, P.O. Box 3889 Curacao / AN | [2000/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clement, Yves 88bis, Rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | Cardy, Sophie Marie Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | Briat, Sophie Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99907658.1 | 04.03.1999 | [2000/51] | WO1999FR00486 | Priority number, date | FR19980002638 | 04.03.1998 Original published format: FR 9802638 | [2000/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9944702 | Date: | 10.09.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1059972 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A63F3/00, A63F1/02 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
A63F3/00157 (EP);
A63F1/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/51] | Title | German: | SPIELANORDNUNG | [2000/51] | English: | PARLOUR GAME SET | [2000/51] | French: | ENSEMBLE POUR JEU DE SOCIETE | [2000/51] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/51] | 02.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/18] | 16.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4878675 (PERRY ET AL.) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US5566945 (SAGUCIO) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5601288 (WHITE ET AL.) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5540444 (NGUYEN) |