EP1059851 - STABLE HOMOGENEOUS EMULSIFIER-FREE SUSPENSION, PREPARATION METHOD AND USES IN FOOD COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 15.03.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2013 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 17.04.2013 [2013/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GERVAIS DANONE 17 Boulevard Haussmann 75009 Paris / FR | [2008/07] |
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GERVAIS-DANONE 126-130 rue Jules Guesde F-92302 Levallois Perret / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOAT, Stéphane 28, chemin de la Justice F-92290 Chatenay Malabry / FR | 02 /
WEILL, Ricardo Emilio Mitre 279 1706 Haedo Pcia de Buenos-Aires / AR | [2013/16] |
Former [2000/51] | 01 /
DOAT, Stéphane 28, chemin de la Justice F-92290 Chatenay Malabry / FR | ||
02 /
WEILL, Ricardo Emilio Mitre 279, 1706 Haedo Pcia de Buenos-Aires / AR | Representative(s) | Grosset-Fournier, Chantal Catherine Grosset-Fournier & Demachy 54, rue Saint-Lazare 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/16] | Grosset-Fournier, Chantal Catherine Grosset-Fournier & Demachy 54, rue Saint-Lazare 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2000/51] | Grosset-Fournier, Chantal Catherine Grosset-Fournier & Demachy s.a.r.l. 20, rue de Maubeuge 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99907661.5 | 04.03.1999 | [2000/51] | WO1999FR00496 | Priority number, date | FR19980002707 | 05.03.1998 Original published format: FR 9802707 | [2000/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9944442 | Date: | 10.09.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1059851 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1059851 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/19] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1059851 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/48, A23L1/03, A23C9/13, A23C11/10, A23C13/14 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
A23C9/13 (EP,US);
A23C9/137 (EP,US);
A23C9/1544 (EP,US);
A23L29/212 (EP,US);
A23L29/231 (EP,US);
A23L29/256 (EP,US);
A23L29/262 (EP,US);
A23L29/27 (EP,US);
A23L29/272 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/51] | Title | German: | HOMOGENE UND STABILE SUSPENSION OHNE EMULGIERMITTEL,VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG IN NAHRUNGSMITTELZUSAMMNENSETZUNGEN | [2000/51] | English: | STABLE HOMOGENEOUS EMULSIFIER-FREE SUSPENSION, PREPARATION METHOD AND USES IN FOOD COMPOSITIONS | [2000/51] | French: | SUSPENSION HOMOGENE STABLE DEPOURVUE D'EMULSIFIANT, SON PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET SON UTILISATION DANS DES COMPOSITIONS ALIMENTAIRES | [2000/51] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/51] | 26.07.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.02.2003
20.02.2003
ADMISSIBLE Raisio Nutrition Ltd. Raisionkaari 55 21200 Raisio / FI Opponent's representative Kirsch, Susan Edith, et al, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | 02
06.02.2003
20.02.2003
ADMISSIBLE Unilever N.V. Weena 455 / Unilever Hse, 100 Victoria Embankment, Blackfriars 3013 AL Rotterdam / London EC4Y 0DY / NL Opponent's representative Waldren, Robin Michael Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | 03
07.02.2003
21.02.2003
ADMISSIBLE McNeil-PPC, Inc. 199 Grandview Road Skillman, NJ 08558 / US Opponent's representative Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.02.2003
20.02.2003
ADMISSIBLE Raisio Nutrition Ltd. Raisionkaari 55 21200 Raisio / FI Opponent's representative Kirsch, Susan Edith, et al, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
02
06.02.2003
20.02.2003
ADMISSIBLE Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL Opponent's representative Waldren, Robin Michael Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | |||
03
07.02.2003
21.02.2003
ADMISSIBLE McNeil-PPC, Inc. Grandview Road Skillman, NJ 08558 / US Opponent's representative Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | |||
Former [2009/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.02.2003
20.02.2003
ADMISSIBLE RAISIO BENECOL LTD. P.O. Box 101 21201 Raisio / FI Opponent's representative Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
02
06.02.2003
20.02.2003
ADMISSIBLE Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL Opponent's representative Waldren, Robin Michael Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | |||
03
07.02.2003
21.02.2003
ADMISSIBLE McNeil-PPC, Inc. Grandview Road Skillman, NJ 08558 / US Opponent's representative Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | |||
Former [2008/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.02.2003
20.02.2003
ADMISSIBLE RAISIO BENECOL LTD. P.O. Box 101 21201 Raisio / FI Opponent's representative Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
02
06.02.2003
20.02.2003
ADMISSIBLE Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL Opponent's representative Joppe, Hermina Laura Petronella Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | |||
03
07.02.2003
21.02.2003
ADMISSIBLE McNeil-PPC, Inc. Grandview Road Skillman, NJ 08558 / US Opponent's representative Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | |||
Former [2006/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.02.2003
20.02.2003
ADMISSIBLE RAISIO BENECOL LTD. P.O. Box 101 21201 Raisio / FI Opponent's representative Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
02
06.02.2003
20.02.2003
ADMISSIBLE Unilever N.V. Weena 455 NL - 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL Opponent's representative Joppe, Hermina Laura Petronella Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | |||
03
07.02.2003
21.02.2003
ADMISSIBLE McNeil-PPC, Inc. Grandview Road Skillman, NJ 08558 / US Opponent's representative Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | |||
Former [2004/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.02.2003
20.02.2003
ADMISSIBLE RAISIO BENECOL LTD. P.O. Box 101 21201 Raisio / FI Opponent's representative Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
02
06.02.2003
20.02.2003
ADMISSIBLE UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL - 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL Opponent's representative Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Unilever N.V. Patent Department Postbus 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | |||
03
07.02.2003
21.02.2003
ADMISSIBLE McNeil-PPC, Inc. Grandview Road Skillman, NJ 08558 / US Opponent's representative Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | |||
Former [2003/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.02.2003
20.02.2003
ADMISSIBLE RAISIO BENECOL LTD. P.O. Box 101 21201 Raisio / FI Opponent's representative Svensson, Johan Henrik Berggren Oy Ab, P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | ||
02
06.02.2003
20.02.2003
ADMISSIBLE UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL - 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL Opponent's representative Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Unilever N.V. Patent Department Postbus 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | |||
03
07.02.2003
21.02.2003
ADMISSIBLE McNeil-PPC, Inc. Grandview Road Skillman, NJ 08558 / US Opponent's representative Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | 18.02.2003 | No. 02: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 14.03.2003 | No. 02: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 25.03.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.10.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.11.2003 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2004 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 17.09.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.10.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.10.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.05.2012 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 01.03.2013 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 07.01.2010 | Appeal received No. T0059/10 | 08.03.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.05.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 29.12.2009 | Appeal received No. T0059/10 | 01.03.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.05.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 24.05.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.06.2012 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 04.03.2003 | MC | 31.03.2003 | CY | 04.03.2005 | [2006/15] |
Former [2005/02] | LU | 04.03.2003 | |
MC | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | LU | 04.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]SU794018 ; | [XA]JPS5642546 ; | [A]FR2240717 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [A] 1-22 * claim - *; | [A]US4195084 (ONG JOHN T H [US]) [A] 1-9; | [A]EP0092076 (NESTLE SA [CH]) [A] 1,2,9 * page 3, lines 24-28; claim - *; | [DX]WO9219640 (RAISION MARGARIINI OY [FI]) [DX] 1-5 * page 7, lines 5-17 * * page 9, lines 21-30 * * examples 2,5; claims 1-7 *; | [A]US5244887 (STRAUB CARL D [US]) [A] 1,2 * claim - *; | [A]WO9638047 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-22* example -; claim - *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 81, no. 40, Database accession no. 1981-73090D, XP002088720 & SU794018 A 19810107 (LENINGRAD FORESTRY ACAD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 81, no. 23, Database accession no. 81-41212D, XP002088721 & JPS5642546 A 19810420 (NISSHIN OIL MILLS LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 9,15,16 |