EP0982120 - SHEET HAVING POWDER COATED THEREON, AND PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2004 [2004/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bando Chemical Industries, Ltd. 2-15, Meiwa-dori 3-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 652-0883 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states BANDO CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-15, Meiwa-dori 3-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-0883 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARAI, T., Bando Chem. Ind., Ltd. 2-15,Meiwadori 3-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-0883 / JP | 02 /
SANO, C., Bando Chem. Ind., Ltd. 2-15, Meiwadori 3-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-0883 / JP | 03 /
SAITOH, K., Bando Chem. Ind., Ltd. 2-15, Meiwadori 3-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-0883 / JP | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Marlow, Nicholas Simon Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Marlow, Nicholas Simon Reddie & Grose 16, Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99907903.1 | 10.03.1999 | [2000/09] | WO1999JP01175 | Priority number, date | JP19980106861 | 12.03.1998 Original published format: JP 10686198 | JP19980209902 | 24.07.1998 Original published format: JP 20990298 | JP19990032547 | 10.02.1999 Original published format: JP 3254799 | [2000/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9946117 | Date: | 16.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0982120 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.09.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B32B9/00, B32B27/00, D21H27/00, B41M5/00, D21H23/64 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
D21H23/64 (EP,US);
B32B9/00 (KR);
B41M5/52 (EP,US);
B41M2205/12 (EP,US);
B41M5/508 (EP,US);
B41M5/5218 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/09] | B32B9/00, B32B27/00, D21H27/00, B41M5/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/09] | Title | German: | PULVERBESCHICHTETES SUBSTRAT,VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG SOWIE SEINE VERWENDUNG | [2000/09] | English: | SHEET HAVING POWDER COATED THEREON, AND PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF | [2000/09] | French: | FEUILLE A REVETEMENT PULVERULENT ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION CORRESPONDANTS | [2000/09] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.1999 | Translation filed | 22.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.1999 | Search fee paid | 22.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/19] | 11.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/19] | 01.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08224970 ; | [PA]JPH10291375 ; | [A]JPH09142045 ; | [E]JPH11254842 ; | [X]EP0751192 (NIPPON CARBIDE KOGYO KK [JP]) [X] 1,7 * example 1; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0782934 (BANDO CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1,7,9 * example - *; | [PA]EP0890447 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-23 * example - *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 45, Database accession no. 1996-450570, XP002135446 & JPH08224970 A 19960903 (BANDO CHEM IND LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990226), vol. 1999, no. 02, & JP10291375 A 19981104 (BANDO CHEM IND LTD) [PA] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970131), vol. 1997, no. 01, & JP08224970 A 19960903 (BANDO CHEM IND LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 20, Database accession no. 1998-220042, XP002135447 & JPH09142045 A 19970603 (BANDO CHEM IND LTD) [A] 1-23 * abstract * | [E] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991222), vol. 1999, no. 14, & JP11254842 A 19990921 (BANDO CHEM IND LTD) [E] 1 * abstract * | [PA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 03, Database accession no. 1999-028540, XP002135448 & JPH10291375 A 19981104 (BANDO CHEM IND LTD) [PA] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS6149883 (CANON KK); | [A]JPH0243083 (CANON KK); | [A]JPH09118068 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [E]JPH10278441 (BANDO CHEMICAL IND); | [E]JPH10297119 (BANDO CHEMICAL IND); | [E]JPH10297116 (BANDO CHEMICAL IND) |