blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0985486

EP0985486 - LEADLESS SOLDER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.05.2005
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 13.07.2005  [2005/28]
27.05.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.07.2005  [2005/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nihon Superior Sha Co., Ltd
16-15, Esakacho 1-chome Suita-shi
Osaka 564-0063 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/11]For all designated states
Nihon Superior Sha Co., Ltd
16-15, Esakacho 1-chome
Suita-shi, Osaka 564-0063 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NISHIMURA, Tetsuro
16-15, Esakacho 1-chome
Suita-shi, Osaka 564-0063 / JP
[2000/11]
Representative(s)Hering, Hartmut
Patentanwälte
Berendt, Leyh & Hering
Innere Wiener Strasse 20
81667 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/11]Hering, Hartmut, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Berendt, Leyh & Hering Innere Wiener Strasse 20
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date99907920.515.03.1999
[2000/11]
WO1999JP01229
Priority number, dateJP1998010014126.03.1998         Original published format: JP 10014198
JP1998032448228.10.1998         Original published format: JP 32448298
JP1998032448328.10.1998         Original published format: JP 32448398
[2000/11]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9948639
Date:30.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0985486
Date:15.03.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0985486
Date:21.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.09.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.11.2002
ClassificationIPC:B23K35/26, C22C13/00
[2000/11]
CPC:
C22C13/00 (EP,KR,US); B23K35/262 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/11]
TitleGerman:BLEIFREIES LOT[2000/11]
English:LEADLESS SOLDER[2000/11]
French:SOUDURE SANS PLOMB[2000/11]
Entry into regional phase06.10.1999Translation filed 
04.11.1999National basic fee paid 
25.11.1999Search fee paid 
04.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
29.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
21.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.05.2004Fee for grant paid
19.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
19.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE21.07.2004
[2005/28]
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPH05251452  ;
 [Y]JPH106075  ;
 [A]US4758407  (BALLENTINE RICHARD E [US], et al);
 [PY]DE19816671  (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [PY] 1-6 * claim - *;
 [PY]DE19752215  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [PY] 1-6 * claim - *;
 [AP]EP0847829  (FORD MOTOR CO [US])
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940107), vol. 018, no. 008, Database accession no. (E - 1486), & JP05251452 A 19930928 (TANAKA DENSHI KOGYO KK) [Y] 1-6 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 05, & JP10006075 A 19980113 (NIPPON HANDA KK) [Y] 1-6 * abstract *
International search[A]JPH0234295  (J W HARRIS CO INC);
 [AE]JPH10180481  (TOPY IND)
 [X]  - "Dai 4 Kai Electronics ni Okeru Micro Ketsugou Jissou Gijutsu Symposium Rombunshuu", issued by THE JAPAN WELDING SOCIETY, 29 January 1998, pp. 285-288.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.