Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] |
17.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] |
03.05.2003 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
03.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
13.12.2002 | Supplementary search report | published on 29.01.2003 [2003/05] |
13.12.2002 | Change - classification | published on 29.01.2003 [2003/05] |
19.04.2002 | Renewal fee | |
10.04.2001 | Renewal fee | |
10.11.2000 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |
10.11.2000 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |
09.11.2000 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.10.2000 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.09.2000 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.09.2000 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.10.1999 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.10.1999 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.10.1999 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.04.1999 | PCT data prior to European publication |