EP1063680 - FLUORESCENT LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHKUBO, Kazuaki 15-1-208, Miyatacho 3-chome Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1142 / JP | 02 /
INOHARA, Makoto 3-7-9, Hoshida-yamate Katano-shi Osaka 576-0014 / JP | 03 /
YANO, Tadashi Room A202 Uisuteria-sorakudai 8-6-24, Sorakudai Kizucho, Soraku-gun Kyoto 619-0223 / JP | 04 /
SHIGETA, Teruaki Ichibankan, Okuhiruzukouri 30-1-501, Mituiminamimachi Neyagawa-shi Osaka 572-0019 / JP | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99907923.9 | 15.03.1999 | [2000/52] | WO1999JP01238 | Priority number, date | JP19980072156 | 20.03.1998 Original published format: JP 7215698 | [2000/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9949496 | Date: | 30.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1063680 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.09.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/10, H01J61/35, H01J61/42, H01J61/38 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
H01J61/025 (EP);
H01J61/10 (EP);
H01J61/42 (EP,KR);
H01J61/72 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/52] | H01J61/10, H01J61/35, H01J61/42 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/52] | Title | German: | LEUCHTSTOFFLAMPE | [2000/52] | English: | FLUORESCENT LAMP | [2000/52] | French: | LAMPE FLUORESCENTE | [2000/52] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2000 | Translation filed | 12.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2000 | Search fee paid | 12.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 12.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 01.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/49] | 09.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO9946799 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [E] 1 * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 12; figure 1 *; | [XA]US3215882 (TOOMEY CHARLES L) [X] 1 * column 2, line 31 - line 46; figures 1,2,4 * [A] 2-11; | [A]GB863467 (GEN ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 6-11 * page 1, line 56 - line 64; figure 1 *; | [A]US2692347 (MASON JULIEN J) [A] 6-11 * column 3, lines 54-59; figures 1,3 * | International search | [Y]JPS3919440Y ; | [X]JPS2810389Y ; | [Y]JPS62177858 (TOSHIBA ELECTRIC EQUIP); | [X]JPS6217059U ; | [X]JPH0721991 (NORITAKE CO LTD, et al) |