EP0982320 - LIGHT-ABSORBING POLYMERS AND APPLICATION THEREOF TO ANTIREFLECTION FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AZ Electronic Materials USA Corp. 70 Meister Avenue Somerville, NJ 08876 / US | [2005/06] |
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states Clariant Finance (BVI) Limited Citco Building, Wickhams Cay, P.O. Box 662 Road Town, Tortola / VG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANG, Wen-Bing Clariant (Japan) K.K., 3810, Chihama Daitocho, Ogasa-gun, Sizuoka 437-1496 / JP | 02 /
NISHIWAKI, Yoshinori Clariant (Japan) K.K., 3810, Chihama Daitocho, Ogasa-gun, Sizuoka 437-1496 / JP | 03 /
KIMURA, Ken Clariant (Japan) K.K., 3810, Chihama Daitocho, Ogasa-gun, Sizuoka 437-1496 / JP | 04 /
MATSUO, Shoko Clariant (Japan) K.K., 3810, Chihama Daitocho, Ogasa-gun, Sizuoka 437-1496 / JP | 05 /
Tanaka, Hatsuyuki Clariant (Japan) K.K., 3810, Chihama Daitocho, Ogasa-gun, Sizuoka 437-1496 / JP | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Isenbruck, Günter, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Isenbruck, Günter, et al Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2005/06] | Isenbruck, Günter, et al Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn, Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2000/09] | Hütter, Klaus, Dr., et al Clariant GmbH Patente, Marken, Lizenzen Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 99907928.8 | 15.03.1999 | [2000/09] | WO1999JP01244 | Priority number, date | JP19980066626 | 17.03.1998 Original published format: JP 6662698 | [2000/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9947571 | Date: | 23.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0982320 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0982320 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.09.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/14, C08F220/20, C08F220/54, C09D5/00, G03F7/11 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
G03F7/091 (EP,US);
C08F8/14 (EP,KR,US);
C08F8/30 (EP,US);
C09D5/32 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/14, C08F220/00 (EP,US);
C08F8/30, C08F220/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/09] | Title | German: | LICHTABSORBIERENDE POLYMERE UND DEREN ANWENDUNG IN ANTIREFLEKTIONSFILMEN | [2000/09] | English: | LIGHT-ABSORBING POLYMERS AND APPLICATION THEREOF TO ANTIREFLECTION FILM | [2000/09] | French: | POLYMERES ABSORBANT LA LUMIERE ET LEUR APPLICATION A UN FILM ANTIREFLET | [2000/09] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.1999 | Translation filed | 17.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.1999 | Search fee paid | 17.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 10.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 09.08.2006 | IT | 09.08.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/17] | IT | 09.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3597468 (KALOPISSIS GREGORIE, et al) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [DY]EP0583205 (IBM [US]) [DY] 1-8 * page 4, line 45 - page 5, line 35; claims 1-23 *; | [PY]EP0861855 (CLARIANT INT LTD [CH]) [PY] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2156309 (BASF AG) [A] 1 * page 3, line 18 - page 5, line 35; claims 1-9 *; | [A]US5654376 (KNORS CHRISTOPHER JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1-12 * | International search | [XP]JPH10199789 (SONY CORP); | [A]JPH0675378 (IBM); | [A]JPH07268036 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [A]JPH07316268 (WAKO PURE CHEM IND LTD, et al) |