28.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] |
15.08.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
21.03.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] |
15.06.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] |
07.07.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] |
11.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.04.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
07.04.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
01.12.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.10.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.06.2005 |
First examination report |
|
08.06.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.03.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.12.2004 |
Change - applicant |
published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] |
24.12.2004 |
Change - representative |
published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] |
22.10.2004 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 08.12.2004 [2004/50] |
13.04.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.04.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.04.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.04.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
31.03.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.05.2000 [2000/20] |
14.01.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.03.2000 [2000/09] |
02.01.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.09.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.04.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|