Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0982320 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2006 | B1 | EP0982320 | 08.12.2004 | A4 | EP0982320 | 01.03.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP9901244 | 15.03.1999 | JP6662698 | 17.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69932676T | 16.08.2007 | T2 | DE69932676D1 | 21.09.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP9901244 | 15.03.1999 | JP6662698 | 17.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6255405 | 03.07.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP9901244 | 15.03.1999 | JP6662698 | 17.03.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9947571 | Global Dossier | 23.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP6662698 | 17.03.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4165922B | Global Dossier | 15.10.2008 | B2 | JPH11263806 | 28.09.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP6662698 | 17.03.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1111547C | 18.06.2003 | C | CN1258302 | 28.06.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP6662698 | 17.03.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20010012648 | 26.02.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP6662698 | 17.03.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW408251B | 11.10.2000 | B | Priority number | Date | JP6662698 | 17.03.1998 |