Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1064527
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
21.03.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
11.02.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.03.2005 [2005/13] |
20.02.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] |
18.02.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.02.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.02.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
25.07.2003 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.03.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.06.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.03.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.03.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.11.2001 |
First examination report |
|
15.11.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
08.03.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.11.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.01.2001 [2001/01] |
17.11.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.01.2001 [2001/01] |
19.10.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.10.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.01.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.09.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.07.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.04.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|