Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9942797 | Global Dossier | 26.08.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2685598 | 20.02.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0008429 | Global Dossier | 17.02.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13025398 | 06.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100630025B | Global Dossier | 27.09.2006 | B1 | KR20010072316 | 31.07.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US13025398 | 06.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100396423B | Global Dossier | 02.09.2003 | B1 | KR20010042000 | 25.05.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US9903978 | 23.02.1999 | US4421798 | 18.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4033939B | Global Dossier | 16.01.2008 | B2 | JPH1055974 | 24.02.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US35930294 | 19.12.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3887452B | Global Dossier | 28.02.2007 | B2 | JPH1098084 | 14.04.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US64147796 | 01.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2711239B | Global Dossier | 10.02.1998 | B2 | JPH08255800 | 01.10.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US35930294 | 19.12.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007208287 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US35930294 | 19.12.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4280421B | Global Dossier | 17.06.2009 | B2 | JP2002522759 | 23.07.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US13025398 | 06.08.1998 | US9917805 | 06.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4511724B | Global Dossier | 28.07.2010 | B2 | JP2002506988 | 05.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US9903978 | 23.02.1999 | US4421798 | 18.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1102970 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2006 | B1 | EP1102970 | 30.05.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13025398 | 06.08.1998 | US9917805 | 06.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1060370 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2003 | B1 | EP1060370 | 20.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2685598 | 20.02.1998 | US9903026 | 11.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0805342 | Global Dossier | 22.01.2003 | B1 | EP0805342 | 05.11.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US64147796 | 01.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0718610 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2001 | B1 | EP0718610 | 26.06.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35930294 | 19.12.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1064527 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2004 | B1 | EP1064527 | 03.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9903978 | 23.02.1999 | US4421798 | 18.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE207611T | 15.11.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US35930294 | 19.12.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE331945T | 15.07.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US13025398 | 06.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69523424T | 27.06.2002 | T2 | DE69523424D1 | 29.11.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US35930294 | 19.12.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69718551T | 20.11.2003 | T2 | DE69718551D1 | 27.02.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US64147796 | 01.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69911927T | 12.08.2004 | T2 | DE69911927D1 | 13.11.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US2685598 | 20.02.1998 | US9903026 | 11.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69916256T | 14.04.2005 | T2 | DE69916256D1 | 13.05.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9903978 | 23.02.1999 | US4421798 | 18.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69932165T | 16.05.2007 | T2 | DE69932165D1 | 10.08.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US13025398 | 06.08.1998 | US9917805 | 06.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100330139B | 20.06.2002 | B1 | KR970077431 | 12.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US64147796 | 01.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100342796B | 30.11.2002 | B1 | KR960026525 | 22.07.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US35930294 | 19.12.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW399147B | 21.07.2000 | B | Priority number | Date | US13025398 | 06.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6406179 | 18.06.2002 | B2 | US2001006530 | 05.07.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75694501 | 08.01.2001 | US13025398 | 06.08.1998 | US2685598 | 20.02.1998 | US4421798 | 18.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2002139790 | 03.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75694501 | 08.01.2001 | US13025398 | 06.08.1998 | US2685598 | 20.02.1998 | US11791802 | 05.04.2002 | US4421798 | 18.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5660472 | 26.08.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US35930294 | 19.12.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5755511 | 26.05.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US64147796 | 01.05.1996 | US35930294 | 19.12.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5848842 | 15.12.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US35930294 | 19.12.1994 | US65074496 | 20.05.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6007241 | 28.12.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US2685598 | 20.02.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6179466 | 30.01.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US64147796 | 01.05.1996 | US35930294 | 19.12.1994 | US4421798 | 18.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6183130 | 06.02.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US13025398 | 06.08.1998 | US2685598 | 20.02.1998 | US4421798 | 18.03.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9947901 | Global Dossier | 23.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US4421798 | 18.03.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW455676B | 21.09.2001 | B | Priority number | Date | US4421798 | 18.03.1998 |