Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1056450
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
17.01.2003 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] |
02.10.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
03.04.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
13.04.2001 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 30.05.2001 [2001/22] |
17.03.2001 |
Change - PCT data |
published on 02.05.2001 [2001/18] |
27.02.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.10.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.12.2000 [2000/49] |
21.10.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.12.2000 [2000/49] |
19.10.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.10.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.10.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
03.10.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.09.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.09.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.04.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|