Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9848789 | Global Dossier | 05.11.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KZ970397 | 26.04.1997 | US5168197 | 03.07.1997 | US93422897 | 19.09.1997 | US93422997 | 19.09.1997 | US93447197 | 19.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9828303 | Global Dossier | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KZ970397 | 26.04.1997 | KZ960995 | 20.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20010041326 | Global Dossier | 15.05.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US3030098 | 25.02.1998 | US9904124 | 25.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007137890 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | KZ970397 | 26.04.1997 | KZ960995 | 20.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3507511B | Global Dossier | 15.03.2004 | B2 | JP2002509532 | 26.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | KZ970397 | 26.04.1997 | US5168197 | 03.07.1997 | US93422897 | 19.09.1997 | US93422997 | 19.09.1997 | US9807989 | 22.04.1998 | US93447197 | 19.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002504509 | Global Dossier | 12.02.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US3030098 | 25.02.1998 | US9904124 | 25.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001505548 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | KZ970397 | 26.04.1997 | KZ960995 | 20.12.1996 | KZ9700006 | 19.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0996441 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2002 | A4 | EP0996441 | 03.05.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KZ970397 | 26.04.1997 | US5168197 | 03.07.1997 | US93422897 | 19.09.1997 | US93422997 | 19.09.1997 | US9807989 | 22.04.1998 | US93447197 | 19.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0946565 | Global Dossier | 15.10.2003 | B1 | EP0946565 | 06.10.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KZ970397 | 26.04.1997 | KZ960995 | 20.12.1996 | KZ9700006 | 19.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7141898 | Global Dossier | 24.11.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | KZ970397 | 26.04.1997 | US5168197 | 03.07.1997 | US93422897 | 19.09.1997 | US93422997 | 19.09.1997 | US9807989 | 22.04.1998 | US93447197 | 19.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2789999 | Global Dossier | 15.09.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US3030098 | 25.02.1998 | US9904124 | 25.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1056450 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2001 | A4 | EP1056450 | 06.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3030098 | 25.02.1998 | US9904124 | 25.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE252104T | 15.11.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | KZ970397 | 26.04.1997 | KZ960995 | 20.12.1996 | KZ9700006 | 19.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9810930 | 26.09.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | KZ970397 | 26.04.1997 | US5168197 | 03.07.1997 | US93422897 | 19.09.1997 | US93422997 | 19.09.1997 | US9807989 | 22.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9909237 | 14.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US3030098 | 25.02.1998 | US9904124 | 25.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2287318 | 05.11.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KZ970397 | 26.04.1997 | US5168197 | 03.07.1997 | US93422897 | 19.09.1997 | US93422997 | 19.09.1997 | US9807989 | 22.04.1998 | US93447197 | 19.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2321719 | 02.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3030098 | 25.02.1998 | US9904124 | 25.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1095845C | 11.12.2002 | C | CN1245501 | 23.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | KZ970397 | 26.04.1997 | KZ960995 | 20.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69725604T | 03.03.2005 | T2 | DE69725604D1 | 20.11.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | KZ970397 | 26.04.1997 | KZ960995 | 20.12.1996 | KZ9700006 | 19.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20010020318 | 15.03.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | KZ973971 | 26.04.1997 | US5168197 | 03.07.1997 | US93422897 | 19.09.1997 | US93422997 | 19.09.1997 | US93447197 | 19.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA99009817 | 21.07.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US5168197 | 03.07.1997 | US93422897 | 19.09.1997 | KZ9703971 | 26.04.1997 | US93422997 | 19.09.1997 | US9807989 | 22.04.1998 | US93447197 | 19.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5902809 | 11.05.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US5168197 | 03.07.1997 | US93422997 | 19.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6020365 | 01.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US5168197 | 03.07.1997 | US93422997 | 19.09.1997 | US16800498 | 07.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6051565 | 18.04.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US3030098 | 25.02.1998 | KZ970397 | 26.04.1997 | US5168197 | 03.07.1997 | US93422897 | 19.09.1997 | US93422997 | 19.09.1997 | US93447197 | 19.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6080741 | 27.06.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US5168197 | 03.07.1997 | US93422997 | 19.09.1997 | US16800598 | 07.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6197767 | 06.03.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | KZ970397 | 26.04.1997 | US5168197 | 03.07.1997 | US93422997 | 19.09.1997 | US16747598 | 07.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6242617 | 05.06.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | KZ9700006 | 19.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6262110 | 17.07.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US3030098 | 25.02.1998 | US36083499 | 26.07.1999 | US5168197 | 03.07.1997 | US93422897 | 19.09.1997 | US93422997 | 19.09.1997 | US93447197 | 19.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6268394 | 31.07.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US3030098 | 25.02.1998 | KZ970397 | 26.04.1997 | US5168197 | 03.07.1997 | US36083299 | 26.07.1999 | US93422897 | 19.09.1997 | US93422997 | 19.09.1997 | US93447197 | 19.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6429203 | 06.08.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US3030098 | 25.02.1998 | US5168197 | 03.07.1997 | US93422897 | 19.09.1997 | US93422997 | 19.09.1997 | US55101600 | 18.04.2000 | US93447197 | 19.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6693127 | 17.02.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US5168197 | 03.07.1997 | US93447197 | 19.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6770673 | 03.08.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US5168197 | 03.07.1997 | US93422897 | 19.09.1997 | US24111099 | 01.02.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9943314 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2001 | A9 | WO9943314 | 02.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3030098 | 25.02.1998 |