|
07.01.2004 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.12.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.12.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
13.09.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.09.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
11.06.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.06.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.06.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.06.2001 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2000 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.10.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.10.2000 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.10.2000 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
07.08.2000 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
07.08.2000 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.06.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
27.06.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.06.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.06.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.06.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.06.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.06.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.06.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.06.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.06.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
27.06.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
27.06.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
27.06.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
27.06.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
27.06.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
27.06.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
27.06.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
27.06.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.06.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.06.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.06.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.06.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.06.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.06.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.06.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.06.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.06.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.06.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.06.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.06.2000 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.06.2000 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.06.2000 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.06.2000 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.04.2000 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
17.04.2000 |
Description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
17.04.2000 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
13.04.2000 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
13.04.2000 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
10 |
|
13.01.2000 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.01.2000 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
13.01.2000 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
07.12.1999 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.1999 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.11.1999 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.11.1999 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.11.1999 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/404 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.11.1999 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/404 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.10.1999 |
Invitation to correct defects in demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
28.10.1999 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.10.1999 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.10.1999 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.10.1999 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.10.1999 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
07.10.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
07.10.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
30.09.1999 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.09.1999 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
17.05.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
14 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
6 |