Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1066692
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
11.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] |
02.01.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.02.2004 [2004/08] |
11.01.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] |
19.12.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.09.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
11.09.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.04.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
05.04.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
15.06.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
27.03.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.03.2001 |
First examination report |
|
06.03.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
24.11.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.01.2001 [2001/02] |
24.11.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.01.2001 [2001/02] |
10.11.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.11.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.04.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|