Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9949592 | Global Dossier | 30.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7913498 | 24.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU760454B | Global Dossier | 15.05.2003 | B2 | AU2823899 | 18.10.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2237289 | 11.05.1998 | US7913498 | 24.03.1998 | CA9900247 | 23.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1066692 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2003 | B1 | EP1066692 | 10.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2237289 | 11.05.1998 | US7913498 | 24.03.1998 | CA9900247 | 23.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9909067 | 06.11.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2237289 | 11.05.1998 | US7913498 | 24.03.1998 | CA9900247 | 23.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2237289 | 11.07.2006 | C | CA2237289 | 24.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7913498 | 24.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2325473 | 20.12.2005 | C | CA2325473 | 30.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2237289 | 11.05.1998 | US7913498 | 24.03.1998 | CA9900247 | 23.03.1999 | CA2325473 | 23.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69905556T | 11.12.2003 | T2 | DE69905556D1 | 03.04.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | CA2237289 | 11.05.1998 | US7913498 | 24.03.1998 | CA9900247 | 23.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6522638 | 18.02.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | CA2237289 | 11.05.1998 | US7913498 | 24.03.1998 | US27509399 | 24.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6920128 | 19.07.2005 | B1 | Priority number | Date | CA2237289 | 11.05.1998 | US7913498 | 24.03.1998 | CA9900247 | 23.03.1999 | US64677300 | 22.09.2000 |