EP1149502 - TONE DETECTION ELIMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2001/44] | For all designated states Nokia Networks OY P.O Box 300 00045 Nokia Group / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOISTINEN, Tommi Kyyhkysmäki 22 B 19 FIN-02600 Espoo / FI | [2001/44] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/44] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99908843.8 | 04.02.1999 | [2001/44] | WO1999EP00729 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0047007 | Date: | 10.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1149502 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1149502 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/30 | [2001/44] | CPC: |
H04W88/181 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2001/44] | Title | German: | BESEITIGUNG VON TONERKENNUNG | [2001/44] | English: | TONE DETECTION ELIMINATION | [2001/44] | French: | SUPPRESSION DE LA DETECTION DE TONALITE | [2001/44] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/44] | 15.10.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 27.08.2003 | CH | 27.08.2003 | IT | 27.08.2003 | LI | 27.08.2003 | NL | 27.08.2003 | SE | 27.11.2003 | ES | 08.12.2003 | [2008/17] |
Former [2004/46] | BE | 27.08.2003 | |
CH | 27.08.2003 | ||
LI | 27.08.2003 | ||
NL | 27.08.2003 | ||
SE | 27.11.2003 | ||
ES | 08.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | BE | 27.08.2003 | |
CH | 27.08.2003 | ||
LI | 27.08.2003 | ||
NL | 27.08.2003 | ||
SE | 27.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | CH | 27.08.2003 | |
LI | 27.08.2003 | ||
NL | 27.08.2003 | ||
SE | 27.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | NL | 27.08.2003 | |
SE | 27.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | NL | 27.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9750262 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [X] 1,2,24,25 * page 21, line 27 - page 22, line 25 * * page 27, line 1 - line 4 *; | [X]EP0589619 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1,2,24,25 * page 3, column 3, line 10 - line 48 *; | [A]EP0332345 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1-3 * page 2, column 2, line 28 - page 3, column 3, line 8 *; | [A]GB2290005 (MOTOROLA LTD [GB]) [A] 1-3,6,8,9 * page 4, line 33 - page 5, line 12 * |