EP0986773 - ACTIVE MATRIX LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TPO Hong Kong Holding Limited Floor 2, Philips Electronics Building 5, Science Park East Avenue Shatin, Hong Kong / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states TPO Hong Kong Holding Limited Philips Electronics Building 5 Science Park East Avenue Shatin, Hong Kong / CN | ||
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNAPP, Alan, G. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
EDWARDS, Martin, J. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | Hutter, Jacobus Johannes, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | Hutter, Jacobus Johannes, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2000/12] | Williamson, Paul Lewis Philips Corporate Intellectual Property, Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99909122.6 | 29.03.1999 | [2000/12] | WO1999IB00542 | Priority number, date | GB19980007184 | 04.04.1998 Original published format: GB 9807184 | [2000/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9952012 | Date: | 14.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0986773 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 14.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/136, G09G3/36 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
G09G3/3659 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0283 (EP,US);
G09G2310/06 (EP,US);
G09G3/3614 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2000/12] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGE MIT AKTIVER MATRIX | [2000/12] | English: | ACTIVE MATRIX LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICES | [2000/12] | French: | DISPOSITIFS D'AFFICHAGE A CRISTAUX LIQUIDES A MATRICE ACTIVE | [2000/12] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 21.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/10] | 14.09.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/10] | 20.10.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9616393 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [A]EP0588398 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al); | [A]US5130829 (SHANNON JOHN M [GB]); | [A]US5686932 (TOMITA SATORU [JP]) |