EP1018308 - BLOCK CONNECTING STRUCTURE AND BAND-SHAPED ORNAMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CITIZEN WATCH CO. LTD. 1-12, Tanashicho 6-chome, Nishitokyo-shi Tokyo 188-8511 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | For all designated states Citizen Watch Co. Ltd. 1-12, Tanashicho 6-chome, Nishitokyo-shi Tokyo 188-8511 / JP | ||
Former [2000/28] | For all designated states Citizen Watch Co., Ltd. 1-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0428 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UJIIE, Shirou 481-5 Oazasanga Shobu-machi Minamisaitama-gun Saitama 346-0104 / JP | [2000/28] | Representative(s) | Blum, Rudolf Emil, et al E. BLUM & Co. AG Patent- und Markenanwälte VSP Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | Blum, Rudolf Emil Ernst, et al c/o E. Blum & Co Patentanwälte Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 99909207.5 | 17.03.1999 | [2000/28] | WO1999JP01328 | Priority number, date | JP19980085097 | 17.03.1998 Original published format: JP 8509798 | [2000/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9947016 | Date: | 23.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1018308 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.09.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A44C5/10 | [2000/28] | CPC: |
A44C5/107 (EP);
A44C5/10 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI [2000/28] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSELEMENT FÜR GLIEDERBAND SOWIE SCHMUCKBAND | [2000/28] | English: | BLOCK CONNECTING STRUCTURE AND BAND-SHAPED ORNAMENT | [2000/28] | French: | STRUCTURE DE LIAISON DE BLOCS ET ORNEMENT EN FORME DE BANDE | [2000/28] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.1999 | Translation filed | 04.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.1999 | Search fee paid | 04.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 01.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/17] | 06.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.02.2000 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   04.02.2000 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0389671 (INT WATCH CO IWC [CH]) [A] 1-8 * column 2, lines 1-53; figure - *; | [A]GB2214778 (LAMBERT FRANK HENRY) [A] 1-8 * page 1; figures 2,3 *; | [A]FR2717991 (BURDET JEAN L SA [FR]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]GB2260072 (STELUX IND LIMITED [HK]) [A] 1-8 * page 1, line 22 - page 3, line 5 * * page 5, line 10 - page 6, line 4 * * figure - * | International search | [Y]JPH0515816U ; | [Y]JPS562809U ; | [Y]JPS58168212U ; | [Y]JPH0333872U ; | [Y]JPH0613519U |