EP1058998 - PROGRAM GUIDE SYSTEM WITH PREFERENCE PROFILES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Video Properties, Inc. 7140 South Lewis Avenue Tulsa, OK 74136 / US | [2000/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELLIS, Michael, D. 1300 Kingwood Place Boulder, CO 80304 / US | 02 /
KNUDSON, Edward, B. 11055 West Rowland Avenue Littleton, CO 80127 / US | 03 /
LEMMONS, Thomas, R. Route 2 Box 1178 Sand Springs, OK 74063 / US | 04 /
HASSELL, Joel, G. 8246 Yarrow Court Arvada, CO 80005 / US | 05 /
KNEE, Robert, A. 747 Grissom Drive Lansdale, PA 19446 / US | 06 /
EASTERBROOK, Kevin, B. 555 Clear Brook Lane Monument, CO 80132 / US | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Hale, Peter, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/38] | Hale, Peter, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2000/50] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99909613.4 | 25.02.1999 | [2000/50] | WO1999US04143 | Priority number, date | US19980034934 | 04.03.1998 Original published format: US 34934 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9945701 | Date: | 10.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1058998 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1058998 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
H04N21/25891 (EP,US);
H04N21/4312 (EP,US);
H04N21/44224 (EP,US);
H04N21/4532 (EP,US);
H04N21/4668 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/47214 (EP,US);
H04N21/4751 (EP,US);
H04N21/4753 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/50] | Title | German: | PROGRAMANWEISUNGSSYSTEM MIT VORZUGSPROFILEN | [2000/50] | English: | PROGRAM GUIDE SYSTEM WITH PREFERENCE PROFILES | [2000/50] | French: | SYSTEME DE GUIDE DE PROGRAMMES COMPORTANT DES PROFILS DE PREFERENCES | [2000/50] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 22.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 05.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.03.2006
12.04.2007
WITHDRAWN Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred Maryniok GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Leibnizstrasse 6 95447 Bayreuth / DE | 02
15.03.2006
15.12.2006
WITHDRAWN Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL Opponent's representative Gravendeel, Cornelis Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.03.2006
12.04.2007
WITHDRAWN Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | ||
02
15.03.2006
15.12.2006
WITHDRAWN Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL Opponent's representative Gravendeel, Cornelis Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2007/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.03.2006
13.04.2006
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | ||
02
15.03.2006
15.12.2006
WITHDRAWN Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL Opponent's representative Gravendeel, Cornelis Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2006/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.03.2006
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | ||
02
15.03.2006
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL Opponent's representative Gravendeel, Cornelis Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | 18.05.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.11.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 21.07.2007 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2007/49] | Request for further processing for: | 15.10.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 05.11.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.11.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.06.2005 | BE | 15.06.2005 | CH | 15.06.2005 | CY | 15.06.2005 | FI | 15.06.2005 | LI | 15.06.2005 | NL | 15.06.2005 | DK | 15.09.2005 | GR | 15.09.2005 | SE | 15.09.2005 | PT | 23.11.2005 | IE | 27.02.2006 | LU | 28.02.2006 | MC | 28.02.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/22] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
IE | 27.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 15.06.2005 | |
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 15.09.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0721253 (SONY ELECTRONICS INC [US]) [A] 1-180* column 16, line 26 - column 20, line 4 *; | [A]US5585866 (MILLER LARRY [US], et al) [A] 1-180 * column 20, line 6 - column 21, line 67; figure 30 *; | [XA]WO9748230 (STARSIGHT TELECAST INC [US]) [X] 1,92 * page 18, line 15 - page 20, line 37 * [A] 2-91,93-180; | [PX]EP0854645 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [PX] 1,92 * column 12, line 3 - line 43 * * column 16, line 32 - column 17, line 32 * | Examination | US5410344 |