EP1062093 - HEAT-SHRINKABLE MULTILAYER PACKAGING FILM COMPRISING INNER LAYER COMPRISING A POLYESTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cryovac, Inc. 100 Rogers Bridge Road, Building A, P.O. Box 464 Duncan South Carolina 29334 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states Cryovac, Inc. 100 Rogers Bridge Road, Building A, P.O. Box 464 Duncan, South Carolina 29334 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMESH, Ram, K. 6 Rosebank Way Greenville, SC 29615 / US | 02 /
WOLF, John, R. 103 Sherwood Street Greenville, SC 29601 / US | 03 /
WOFFORD, George, D. 108 Beardon Drive Duncan, SC 29334 / US | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99909785.0 | 04.03.1999 | [2000/52] | WO1999US04684 | Priority number, date | US19980034836 | 04.03.1998 Original published format: US 34836 | [2000/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9944823 | Date: | 10.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1062093 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1062093 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/08, B65D65/40 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
Y10S428/91 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2495 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31565 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31573 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31587 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31797 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/52] | Title | German: | EINE INNENSCHICHT AUS POLYESTER ENTHALTENDE HEISSSCHRUMPFFÄHIGE MEHRSCHICHTVERPACKUNGSFOLIE | [2000/52] | English: | HEAT-SHRINKABLE MULTILAYER PACKAGING FILM COMPRISING INNER LAYER COMPRISING A POLYESTER | [2000/52] | French: | FILM THERMORETRACTABLE MULTICOUCHE D'EMBALLAGE A COUCHE INTERIEURE DE POLYESTER | [2000/52] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 09.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.06.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.05.2003 | BE | 28.05.2003 | CH | 28.05.2003 | CY | 28.05.2003 | FI | 28.05.2003 | LI | 28.05.2003 | DK | 28.08.2003 | GR | 28.08.2003 | PT | 28.08.2003 | SE | 28.08.2003 | ES | 08.09.2003 | [2007/22] |
Former [2004/28] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
BE | 28.05.2003 | ||
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 28.05.2003 | |
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 28.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4188443 (MUELLER WALTER B [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,16,19,20 * example 4; claim 10 *; | [A]EP0476836 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-27 * page 2, line 42 - line 52 * * page 3, line 45 - page 4, line 3 * * see comparative example 2;; example 4 *; | [DA]US5336549 (NISHIMOTO YOSHIHARU [JP], et al)[DA] 1-27 |