Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP1059943 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

AU2891699 AU4750801 EP01920460 EP04028314 EP99909789 JP2000534243 JP2010152667 US0108529W US201313961674 US201314075536

More

US53407009 US70491903 US9904689W



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO0170291Global Dossier 10.01.2002A3
WO0170291 27.09.2001A2
Priority number Date
US52899100 20.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9295648Global Dossier 29.03.2016B2
US2014065233 06.03.2014A1
Priority number Date
US7716698 06.03.1998
US53407009 31.07.2009
US70491903 12.11.2003
US201314075536 08.11.2013
US26377399 05.03.1999
US52899100 20.03.2000
US201313961674 07.08.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8658215Global Dossier 25.02.2014B2
US2013323316 05.12.2013A1
Priority number Date
US7716698 06.03.1998
US53407009 31.07.2009
US70491903 12.11.2003
US26377399 05.03.1999
US52899100 20.03.2000
US201313961674 07.08.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9205053Global Dossier 08.12.2015B2
US2011033508 10.02.2011A1
Priority number Date
US7716698 06.03.1998
US53407009 31.07.2009
US70491903 12.11.2003
US26377399 05.03.1999
US52899100 20.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2004096514Global Dossier 20.05.2004A1
Priority number Date
US70491903 12.11.2003
US26377399 05.03.1999
US52899100 20.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5095049BGlobal Dossier 12.12.2012B2
JP2002505308 19.02.2002A
Priority number Date
US7716698 06.03.1998
US9904689 04.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1522317Global Dossier 13.04.2005A1
Priority number Date
US7716698 06.03.1998
EP99909789 04.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1267956Global Dossier 02.01.2003A2
Priority number Date
US0108529 15.03.2001
US52899100 20.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU4750801Global Dossier 03.10.2001A
Priority number Date
US0108529 15.03.2001
US52899100 20.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU742786BGlobal Dossier 10.01.2002B2
AU2891699 20.09.1999A
Priority number Date
US7716698 06.03.1998
US9904689 04.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1059943Global Dossier 01.12.2004B1
EP1059943 20.12.2000A1
Priority number Date
US7716698 06.03.1998
US9904689 04.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ATE283709T 15.12.2004T1
Priority number Date
US7716698 06.03.1998
US9904689 04.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2322954 07.06.2011C
CA2322954 10.09.1999A1
Priority number Date
US7716698 06.03.1998
US9904689 04.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69922352T 15.12.2005T2
DE69922352D1 05.01.2005D1
Priority number Date
US7716698 06.03.1998
US9904689 04.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1035318 23.11.2001A1
Priority number Date
US7716698 06.03.1998
US9904689 04.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7060298 13.06.2006B2
US2002068089 06.06.2002A1
Priority number Date
US7716698 06.03.1998
US26377399 05.03.1999
US2929401 28.12.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6335028 01.01.2002B1
Priority number Date
US7716698 06.03.1998
US26377399 05.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6660301 09.12.2003B1
Priority number Date
US7716698 06.03.1998
US26377399 05.03.1999
US52899100 20.03.2000
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9944643Global Dossier 10.09.1999A1
Priority number Date
US7716698 06.03.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2010248233Global Dossier 04.11.2010A
Priority number Date
US7716698 06.03.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN100457188C 04.02.2009C
CN1299291 13.06.2001A
Priority number Date
US7716698 06.03.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1714783 04.01.2006A
Priority number Date
US7716698 06.03.1998
TypeType Divisional application
 EP1522317