EP1066571 - METHOD, APPARATUS, SYSTEM, AND PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR ATTACHING FILES AND OTHER OBJECTS TO A PARTIALLY REPLICATED DATABASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siebel Systems, Inc. 1855 South Grant Street San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | [2001/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRODERSEN, Robert, A. 17 Spinnaker Place Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | 02 /
CHATTERJEE, Prashant 21281 Glenmont Drive Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | 03 /
COHEN, Jeffrey 499 East McKinley Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 04 /
LIM, Peter, S. 917 Governors Bay Drive Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | [2001/02] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2018/02] |
Former [2008/43] | Lord, Michael Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2008/24] | Lord, Michael Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2001/02] | Abnett, Richard Charles REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99909792.6 | 03.03.1999 | [2001/02] | WO1999US04696 | Priority number, date | US19980076681P | 03.03.1998 Original published format: US 76681 P | [2001/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9945482 | Date: | 10.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1066571 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1066571 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.09.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
G06F16/275 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2018/02] |
Former [2001/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, GERÄT, SYSTEM UND PROGRAMM UM DATEIEN UND ANDERE OBJEKTE MIT EINER TEILWEISE REPLIZIERTEN DATENBANK ZU VERBINDEN | [2017/32] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS, SYSTEM, AND PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR ATTACHING FILES AND OTHER OBJECTS TO A PARTIALLY REPLICATED DATABASE | [2001/02] | French: | METHODE, APPAREIL, SYSTEME ET PRODUIT PROGRAMME PERMETTANT D'ANNEXER DES FICHIERS ET D'AUTRES OBJETS A UNE BASE DE DONNEES PARTIELLEMENT REPRODUITE | [2001/02] |
Former [2001/02] | VERFAHREN, GERÄT, SYSTEM UND PROGRAMM ZUM ERSTELLEN VON AKTEN UND ANDEREN OBJEKTEN ZU EINER TEILWEISE UNTERTEILTEN DATENBASIS | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2000 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 05.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.07.2017 | 03.07.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 21.12.2017 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 19 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.01.2018 | CY | 10.01.2018 | DK | 10.01.2018 | ES | 10.01.2018 | FI | 10.01.2018 | IT | 10.01.2018 | MC | 10.01.2018 | NL | 10.01.2018 | PT | 10.01.2018 | SE | 10.01.2018 | IE | 03.03.2018 | LU | 03.03.2018 | FR | 10.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | GR | 11.04.2018 | [2020/28] |
Former [2019/23] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
IE | 03.03.2018 | ||
LU | 03.03.2018 | ||
FR | 10.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
IE | 03.03.2018 | ||
LU | 03.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
IE | 03.03.2018 | ||
LU | 03.03.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
LU | 03.03.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 10.01.2018 | |
NL | 10.01.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0740258 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-13 * column 4, line 31 - column 6, line 15; figures 1-3 * * column 9, line 17 - column 12, line 26; figure 7 * * column 16, line 17 - line 53 *; | [X] - JUDITH R. DAVIS, "Creating An Extensible, Object-Relational Data Management Environment - IBM?s DB2 Universal Database", DATABASE TECHNOLOGY REPORTS OF DATABASE ASSOCIATES INTERNATIONAL, (199611), XP002474954 [X] 1-13 * page 8, paragraph L - page 11, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 * | [X] - JUDITH R. DAVIS, "Datalinks: Managing External Data with DB2 Universal Database", DATABASE TECHNOLOGY REPORTS OF DATABASE ASSOCIATES INTERNATIONAL, (199708), XP002474967 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5613108 (MORIKAWA TAKASHI [JP]); | [XP]US5781901 (KUZMA ANDREW J [US]); | [YP]US5778368 (HOGAN KEITH [US], et al); | [YP]US5855014 (SMITH GORDON SAMUEL [US]) |