EP1087895 - TOTE BIN LINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/14] | IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO TOTE BINS | ||
[2006/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rapak Asia Pacific Limited 31 Ballarat Street Ellerslie Auckland / NZ | [2006/29] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states Rapak Asia Pacific Limited 31 Ballarat Street Ellerslie, Auckland / NZ | ||
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states SOUTHCORP AUSTRALIA PTY. LTD. Level 23, 91 King William Street Adelaide, S.A. 5000 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSON, Ian 5 Aruma Street Warneet, VIC 3980 / AU | [2001/14] | Representative(s) | Gee, Steven William D.W. & S.W. GEE 1 South Lynn Gardens London Road Shipston on Stour, Warwickshire CV36 4ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | Gee, Steven William 1 South Lynn Gardens, London Road Shipston on Stour, Warwickshire CV36 4ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 99910023.3 | 18.03.1999 | [2001/14] | WO1999AU00178 | Priority number, date | AU1998PP02435 | 18.03.1998 Original published format: AU PP243598 | [2001/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9947432 | Date: | 23.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1087895 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1087895 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 23.09.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65D77/06, B65D30/24, B29C63/28, B67D3/04, B67B7/46, B65B55/02, A61L2/00 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
B67B7/26 (EP,US);
B65B55/022 (EP,US);
B65D77/067 (EP,US);
B67D3/047 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/14] | B65D77/06, B65D17/44, B65D30/24, B65D47/38, B29C63/28, B67D3/04, B67B7/46, B65B55/02, A61L2/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/14] | Title | German: | BEUTELEINSATZT FÜR LAGERBEHÄLTERN | [2006/05] | English: | TOTE BIN LINER | [2006/05] | French: | DOUBLURE POUR BAC DE MANUTENTION | [2006/05] |
Former [2001/14] | VERBESSERUNGEN AN LAGERBEHÄLTERN | ||
Former [2001/14] | IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO TOTE BINS | ||
Former [2001/14] | AMELIORATIONS CONCERNANT DES BACS A MANUTENTION | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2000 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 12.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/14] | 10.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.06.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.07.2006 | BE | 19.07.2006 | CH | 19.07.2006 | CY | 19.07.2006 | FI | 19.07.2006 | LI | 19.07.2006 | NL | 19.07.2006 | DK | 19.10.2006 | SE | 19.10.2006 | GR | 20.10.2006 | PT | 19.12.2006 | LU | 18.03.2007 | IE | 19.03.2007 | MC | 31.03.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/21] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CH | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
GR | 20.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
IE | 19.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/17] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CH | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
IE | 19.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
BE | 19.07.2006 | ||
CH | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
CH | 19.07.2006 | ||
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 19.07.2006 | |
FI | 19.07.2006 | ||
LI | 19.07.2006 | ||
NL | 19.07.2006 | ||
DK | 19.10.2006 | ||
SE | 19.10.2006 | ||
PT | 19.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4732298 (DINSLAGE WILFRIED [DE]) [A] 1,20* figure 1 * | International search | [X]EP0072699 (WRIGHTCEL LTD [AU]); | [X]DE3510859 (NILGEN ELMAR [DE]); | [X]EP0271242 (COURTAULDS PACKAGING AUSTRALIA [AU]) |