EP1055232 - OPTICAL RECORDING MEDIUM BASED ON THIN RECORDING LAYERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology P.O. Box 111 Suwon 440-600 / KR | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [2000/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Sung, Hoon Samsung Advanced Inst. of Techn.(SAIT) P.O.Box 111 Suwon 440-600 / KR | 02 /
MAHY, Jan, Willem, Gaston Weerdesteinlaan 8 NL-6825 AB Arnhem / NL | 03 /
DUBBELDAM, Gerrit, Cornelis Cimbaal 16 NL-6904 PH Zevenaar / NL | 04 /
VAN WIJK, Freddy, Gerhard, Hendrikus Apeldoornseweg 24 NL-6814 BK Arnhem / NL | [2000/48] | Representative(s) | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis AKZO NOBEL N.V. Patent Department (Dept. CO) P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 99910178.5 | 03.02.1999 | [2000/48] | WO1999EP00666 | Priority number, date | EP19980200452 | 13.02.1998 Original published format: EP 98200452 | EP19980200838 | 17.03.1998 Original published format: EP 98200838 | [2000/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9941742 | Date: | 19.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1055232 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1055232 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24 | [2000/48] | CPC: |
G11B7/258 (EP);
G11B7/24047 (KR);
G11B7/24062 (KR);
G11B7/243 (EP);
G11B7/254 (KR);
G11B7/257 (EP);
G11B2007/24306 (EP);
G11B2007/24308 (EP);
G11B2007/24312 (EP);
G11B2007/2432 (EP);
G11B2007/25706 (EP);
G11B2007/25708 (EP);
G11B2007/2571 (EP);
G11B7/00455 (EP);
G11B7/0052 (EP);
G11B7/007 (EP);
G11B7/24 (EP);
G11B7/2534 (EP);
G11B7/2585 (EP);
G11B7/259 (EP);
G11B7/2595 (EP);
G11B7/26 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [2000/48] | Title | German: | OPTISCHES AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDUM MIT DÜNNEN AUFZEICHNUNGSSCHICHTEN | [2000/48] | English: | OPTICAL RECORDING MEDIUM BASED ON THIN RECORDING LAYERS | [2000/48] | French: | SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT OPTIQUE SUR COUCHES D'ENREGISTREMENT MINCES | [2000/48] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 12.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0777224 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1,3,6,9 * figures 6,7; example 1; claims 1-7,10,11 * [A] 2,4,5,7,8; | [PX]EP0836179 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [PX] 1,3-8 * column 2, line 32 - line 37 * * column 3, line 16 - column 7, line 30; figure 2; examples 1,5 * |