EP1064780 - IMAGING DEVICE FOR IMAGING RADIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIMAGE OY Olarinluoma 15 02200 Espoo / FI | [2001/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PYYHTIA, Jouni, Iiari Kylätorintie 3 A 2 FIN-02770 Espoo / FI | 02 /
ERALUOTO, Markku, Tapio Leilankuja 4 A 5 FIN-02230 Espoo / FI | [2003/43] |
Former [2001/03] | 01 /
PYYHTIA, Jouni, Iiari Kylätorintie 3 A 2 FIN-02770 Espooa / FI | ||
02 /
ERALUOTO, Markku, Tapio Leilankuja 4 A 5 FIN-02230 Espoo / FI | |||
Former [2001/01] | 01 /
PYYHTIA, Jouni, Iiari Rasinkatu 20 A 84 FIN-01360 Vantaa / FI | ||
02 /
ERALUOTO, Markku, Tapio Leilankuja 4 A 5 FIN-02230 Espoo / FI | Representative(s) | Spaargaren, Jerome, et al Electronic Intellectual Property Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | Spaargaren, Jerome, et al Electronic Intellectual Property, Suite 308, The Foundry, 156 Blackfriars Road London SE1 8EN / GB | ||
Former [2003/22] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2001/01] | Potter, Julian Mark D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99910298.1 | 24.02.1999 | [2001/01] | WO1999EP01282 | Priority number, date | GB19980006068 | 20.03.1998 Original published format: GB 9806068 | [2001/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9949650 | Date: | 30.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1064780 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1064780 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/15, H04N5/32 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
H04N23/71 (EP,US);
H01L27/14659 (EP,US);
H04N23/30 (EP);
H04N25/53 (US);
H04N5/32 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/01] | Title | German: | BILDAUFNAHMEGERÄT ZUR BILDAUFNAHME VON STRAHLUNG | [2001/01] | English: | IMAGING DEVICE FOR IMAGING RADIATION | [2001/01] | French: | IMAGEUR DESTINE A UN RAYONNEMENT D'IMAGERIE | [2001/01] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 18.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 18.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/42] | Request for further processing for: | 18.07.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 18.07.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.08.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   07.08.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.10.2003 | BE | 22.10.2003 | CH | 22.10.2003 | CY | 22.10.2003 | FI | 22.10.2003 | FR | 22.10.2003 | IT | 22.10.2003 | LI | 22.10.2003 | NL | 22.10.2003 | DK | 22.01.2004 | GR | 22.01.2004 | SE | 22.01.2004 | ES | 02.02.2004 | GB | 24.02.2004 | IE | 24.02.2004 | LU | 24.02.2004 | MC | 28.02.2004 | PT | 22.03.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/22] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
BE | 22.10.2003 | ||
CH | 22.10.2003 | ||
CY | 22.10.2003 | ||
FI | 22.10.2003 | ||
FR | 22.10.2003 | ||
LI | 22.10.2003 | ||
NL | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
ES | 02.02.2004 | ||
GB | 24.02.2004 | ||
IE | 24.02.2004 | ||
LU | 24.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
BE | 22.10.2003 | ||
CH | 22.10.2003 | ||
FI | 22.10.2003 | ||
FR | 22.10.2003 | ||
LI | 22.10.2003 | ||
NL | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
ES | 02.02.2004 | ||
GB | 24.02.2004 | ||
IE | 24.02.2004 | ||
LU | 24.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
BE | 22.10.2003 | ||
CH | 22.10.2003 | ||
FI | 22.10.2003 | ||
LI | 22.10.2003 | ||
NL | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
ES | 02.02.2004 | ||
GB | 24.02.2004 | ||
IE | 24.02.2004 | ||
LU | 24.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
BE | 22.10.2003 | ||
CH | 22.10.2003 | ||
FI | 22.10.2003 | ||
LI | 22.10.2003 | ||
NL | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
ES | 02.02.2004 | ||
GB | 24.02.2004 | ||
IE | 24.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
BE | 22.10.2003 | ||
CH | 22.10.2003 | ||
FI | 22.10.2003 | ||
LI | 22.10.2003 | ||
NL | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
ES | 02.02.2004 | ||
GB | 24.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
BE | 22.10.2003 | ||
CH | 22.10.2003 | ||
FI | 22.10.2003 | ||
LI | 22.10.2003 | ||
NL | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
ES | 02.02.2004 | ||
GB | 24.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
BE | 22.10.2003 | ||
CH | 22.10.2003 | ||
FI | 22.10.2003 | ||
LI | 22.10.2003 | ||
NL | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
ES | 02.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
CH | 22.10.2003 | ||
FI | 22.10.2003 | ||
LI | 22.10.2003 | ||
NL | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
ES | 02.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
CH | 22.10.2003 | ||
FI | 22.10.2003 | ||
LI | 22.10.2003 | ||
NL | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
CH | 22.10.2003 | ||
FI | 22.10.2003 | ||
LI | 22.10.2003 | ||
NL | 22.10.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
FI | 22.10.2003 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 22.10.2003 | |
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 22.01.2004 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB2289981 (SIMAGE OY [FI]); | [XY]EP0817472 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) |