EP1058966 - METHOD FOR QUANTIZING BINARY SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vonhoerner & Sulger GmbH Schlossplatz 8 68723 Schwetzingen / DE | [2000/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENKEL, Hartmut In den Auwiesen 6 D-68723 Oftersheim / DE | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Mierswa, Klaus Iridium IP Friedrich-König-Strasse 3-5 68167 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | Mierswa, Klaus Rechtsanwalt, Friedrichstr. 171 68199 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 99910303.9 | 27.02.1999 | [2000/50] | WO1999EP01297 | Priority number, date | DE1998108874 | 03.03.1998 Original published format: DE 19808874 | [2000/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9945648 | Date: | 10.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1058966 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1058966 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H03K11/00 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
H03K11/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL [2000/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR QUANTISIERUNG VON BINÄRSIGNALEN | [2000/50] | English: | METHOD FOR QUANTIZING BINARY SIGNALS | [2000/50] | French: | PROCEDE DE QUANTIFICATION DE SIGNAUX BINAIRES | [2000/50] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 25.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 12.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/02] | Request for further processing for: | 12.10.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 12.10.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.11.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 16.01.2002 | FR | 16.01.2002 | GB | 16.01.2002 | NL | 16.01.2002 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/10] | FI | 16.01.2002 | |
GB | 16.01.2002 | ||
NL | 16.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | FI | 16.01.2002 | |
GB | 16.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 16.01.2002 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5448202 (OWEN JEFFREY R [US]) [DA] 1 * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 7 * * column 4, line 36 - column 7, line 12; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5245557 (UPTON ERIC L [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 3; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0517533 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 35 - page 5, line 13; figure 3 *; | [A]US3989961 (MASRELIEZ C JOHAN) [A] 1 * column 4, line 18 - line 54; figure 1 * |