EP1068590 - CONTACTLESS INTEGRATED CIRCUIT CARD COMPRISING INHIBITING MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEMPLUS Avenue du Pic de Bertagne, Parc d'Activités de Gémenos 13881 Gémenos Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states Gemplus Avenue du Pic de Bertagne, Parc d'Activités de Gémenos 13881 Gémenos Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATRICE, Philippe, Bâtiment D Résidence les 2 Moulins, Avenue Jean Roque F-13190 Allauch / FR | 02 /
ODDOU, Laurent 26, résidence les Restanques F-13600 La Ciotat / FR | 03 /
FREEMAN, Ray 3, chemin des Mayonnettes F-13420 Gémenos / FR | 04 /
DEFFONTAINES, Thierry Le Petit Rouvière F-13380 Roquefort la Bedoule / FR | 05 /
ZAFRANY, Michael 6, avenue de Corinthe F-13006 Marseille / FR | [2001/03] | Application number, filing date | 99910435.9 | 26.03.1999 | [2001/03] | WO1999FR00704 | Priority number, date | FR19980004197 | 30.03.1998 Original published format: FR 9804197 | [2001/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9950789 | Date: | 07.10.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1068590 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1068590 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
G06K19/07726 (EP,US);
G06K19/073 (EP,US);
G06K19/07749 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, PT [2001/03] | Title | German: | KONTAKLOSE IC KARTE MIT SPERRMITTELN | [2003/27] | English: | CONTACTLESS INTEGRATED CIRCUIT CARD COMPRISING INHIBITING MEANS | [2001/03] | French: | CARTE A CIRCUIT INTEGRE SANS CONTACT COMPORTANT DES MOYENS D'INHIBITION | [2001/03] |
Former [2001/03] | KONTAKLOSE IC KARTE MIT HEMMUNGSMITTELN | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 28.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.12.2003 | BE | 31.03.2004 | CH | 31.03.2004 | LI | 31.03.2004 | PT | 03.05.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2005/21] | AT | 03.12.2003 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 03.12.2003 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 03.12.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9312513 (GUSTAFSON AKE [CH]) [A] 1,2,5,6,9 * abstract * * page 9, line 10 - page 10, line 25; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0706153 (ARTIGRAFICHE PAGANI SRL [IT]) [A] 1* abstract * | Examination | EP0899683 | EP0901101 |