EP1064414 - FORMING A PLAIN BEARING LINING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANA CORPORATION 4500 Dorr Street Toledo, OH 43615 / US | [2001/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERRIN, Carl Glacier Vandervell Technology Centre Cawston House Cawston, Rugby Warwickshire CV22 7SD / GB | 02 /
McCARTNEY, David, Graham, University of Nottingham School of Mech. M M E & M University Park Nottingham NG7 2RD / GB | 03 /
HORLOCK, Andrew, John, University of Nottingham School of Mech. M M E & M University Park Nottingham NG7 2RD / GB | 04 /
HARRIS, Samuel, James, University of Nottingham School of Mech. M M E & M University Park Nottingham NG7 2RD / GB | 05 /
STURGEON, Andrew, John The Welding Institute Abington Hall Abington Cambridge CB1 6AL / GB | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | HGF Orlando House 11c Compstall Road Marple Bridge Stockport SK6 5HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | Harrison Goddard Foote Orlando House 11c Compstall Road Marple Bridge Stockport SK6 5HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99910483.9 | 12.03.1999 | [2001/01] | WO1999GB00748 | Priority number, date | GB19980005347 | 14.03.1998 Original published format: GB 9805347 | GB19980005353 | 14.03.1998 Original published format: GB 9805353 | [2001/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9947723 | Date: | 23.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1064414 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1064414 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/08, C23C4/12 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
C23C4/00 (EP,US);
F16C33/14 (EP,US);
F16C2204/22 (EP,US);
F16C2220/60 (EP,US);
F16C2223/08 (EP,US);
F16C2223/42 (EP,US);
Y10S384/912 (EP,US);
Y10S428/937 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12021 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12063 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12458 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12757 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12764 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2002/32] |
Former [2001/01] | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER GLEITLAGERBESCHICHTUNG | [2001/01] | English: | FORMING A PLAIN BEARING LINING | [2001/01] | French: | FORMATION D'UN REVETEMENT DE PALIER LISSE | [2001/01] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 04.12.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH05272470 ; | [A]JPH05339700 ; | [A]DE3705904 (INTERATOM [DE]); | [X]US5080056 (KRAMER MARTIN S [US], et al); | [A]GB2251661 (DAIDO METAL CO [JP]); | [X]EP0517191 (LINDE AG [DE]); | [X]EP0561391 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]US5271967 (KRAMER MARTIN S [US], et al); | [X]EP0607779 (PERKIN ELMER CORP [US]); | [X]WO9418463 (KREBSOEGE GMBH SINTERMETALL [DE], et al); | [A]WO9604485 (PANKL GEROLD [AT], et al); | [X]WO9605331 (TELATEK OY [FI]); | [X]EP0776986 (TAIHO KOGYO CO LTD [JP], et al); | [X]EP0825272 (SULZER METCO JAPAN LTD [JP]) |