EP1153788 - HYBRID DRIVE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Diesel Motor Co., Ltd. 1, Ooaza 1-chome Ageo-shi Saitama 362-8523 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | For all designated states NISSAN DIESEL MOTOR CO., LTD. 1, Ooaza 1-chome Ageo-shi Saitama 362-8523 / JP | ||
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states Nissan Diesel Co., Ltd. 1, Ooaza 1-chome Ageo-shi, Saitama 362-8523 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMADA, Jun 1, Ooaza 1-chome Ageo-shi Saitama 362-8523 / JP | 02 /
YAMADA, Yoshiaki 1, Ooaza 1-chome Ageo-shi Saitama 362-8523 / JP | 03 /
WATANABE, Yoshito 1, Ooaza 1-chome Ageo-shi Saitama 362-8523 / JP | 04 /
SASAKI, Masakazu 1, Ooaza 1-chome Ageo-shi Saitama 362-8523 / JP | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99910686.7 | 24.03.1999 | [2001/46] | WO1999JP01494 | Priority number, date | JP19980360483 | 18.12.1998 Original published format: JP 36048398 | [2001/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0037278 | Date: | 29.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1153788 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.06.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60L11/18, B60L11/00 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
B60K6/28 (EP,US);
B60L50/50 (KR);
B60K6/46 (EP,US);
B60L50/40 (EP,US);
B60L58/10 (EP,US);
B60W10/26 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/46] | B60L11/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2001/46] | Title | German: | HYBRIDES AUTRIEBSSYSTEM | [2001/47] | English: | HYBRID DRIVE SYSTEM | [2001/46] | French: | SYSTEME D'ENTRAINEMENT HYBRIDE | [2001/46] |
Former [2001/46] | HYBRIDES AUTRIEBS SYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2001 | Translation filed | 18.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2001 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 18.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 02.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/15] | 08.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH10108361 ; | [A]JPH0194182 ; | [A]JPH0984274 ; | [Y]EP0564149 (JEOL LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * column 5, line 16 - column 13, line 50; figures 1-11 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, & JP10108361 A 19980424 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010605), vol. 2000, no. 18, & JP01094182 A 19890412 (NIPPON AIR BRAKE CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 1997, no. 07, & JP09084274 A 19970328 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH1094182 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]JPH10108304 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS); | [A]JPH10108361 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]JPH10174210 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]JPH10178705 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS) |