EP0986231 - SOFTWARE START-UP METHOD FOR A TRANSMITTER HAVING A PLURALITY OF REDUNDANCY SWITCHING FUNCTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/11] | TRANSMITTER HAVING REDUNDANCY SWITCHING FUNCTION AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME | ||
[2005/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BABA, Kenji 1-763-95, Ogawacho Kodaira-shi, Tokyo 187-0032 / JP | [2000/11] | Representative(s) | Granleese, Rhian Jane, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | Granleese, Rhian Jane, et al Marks & Clerk, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 99910753.5 | 29.03.1999 | [2000/11] | WO1999JP01604 | Priority number, date | JP19980080822 | 27.03.1998 Original published format: JP 8082298 | [2000/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9951004 | Date: | 07.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0986231 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0986231 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.10.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/14, H04J3/00, G06F9/445, H04L12/56, G06F11/14 | [2003/34] | CPC: |
G06F11/1417 (EP);
G06F11/1446 (EP);
H04J2203/0057 (EP);
H04J2203/006 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/11] | H04L29/14, H04J3/00 | Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2000/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR INITIALISIERUNG VON SOFTWARE FÜR SENDER MIT MEHREREN REDUNDANTEN SCHALTFUNKTIONEN | [2005/06] | English: | SOFTWARE START-UP METHOD FOR A TRANSMITTER HAVING A PLURALITY OF REDUNDANCY SWITCHING FUNCTIONS | [2005/06] | French: | PROCEDE D'INITIALISATION DE LOGICIEL POUR UN EMETTEUR POSSEDANT PLUSIERS FONCTIONS DE COMMUTATION REDONDANTES | [2005/06] |
Former [2000/11] | SENDER MIT REDUKDANTER SCHALTFUNKTION UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER STEUERUNG | ||
Former [2000/11] | TRANSMITTER HAVING REDUNDANCY SWITCHING FUNCTION AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SAME | ||
Former [2000/11] | EMETTEUR POSSEDANT UNE FONCTION DE COMMUTATION REDONDANTE ET PROCEDE DE CONTROLE DE CETTE FONCTION | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.1999 | Translation filed | 21.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.1999 | Search fee paid | 21.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/11] | 19.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9300628 (AST RESEARCH INC [US]) [A] 1,2,4-7 * abstract * * page 10, line 35 - page 11, line 32 * * page 14, line 15 - page 15, line 19 *; | [A]JPH09233157 ; | [A]US5038320 (HEATH CHESTER A [US], et al) [A] 3,4,6,7 * abstract * * column 3, line 19 - column 4, line 14 * * column 4, line 31 - line 39 *; | [A]GB1481108 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1,2,6,7 * page 1, column L, line 43 - column R, line 91 * * page 12, column L, line 63 - column R, line 118 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP09233157 A 19970905 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD;NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP | International search | [X]JPH09233157 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD, et al); | [A]JPH09135228 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JPH09284362 (NIPPON ELECTRIC ENG) |