EP0987544 - SUBSTRATE DETERMINING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEDA, Shin 5-16-205, Fujigao 2-chome Katano-shi, Osaka 576-0022 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIOKA, Toshihiko 15-15-307, Takatsukacho Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0035 / JP | 03 /
NANKAI, Shiro 50-12, Nasuzukuri 4-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0071 / JP | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Widenmayerstraße 4 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 4 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/27] | Jung Schirdewahn Grünberg Schneider Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 4 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/43] | Schirdewahn, Jürgen, et al Jung Schirdewahn Lemke Clemensstrasse 30 80803 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/12] | Jung, Elisabeth, Dr. Patentanwälte, Dr. Elisabeth Jung, Dr. Jürgen Schirdewahn, Claus Gernhardt, Postfach 40 14 68 80714 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99910795.6 | 31.03.1999 | [2000/12] | WO1999JP01706 | Priority number, date | JP19980089740 | 02.04.1998 Original published format: JP 8974098 | JP19980172766 | 19.06.1998 Original published format: JP 17276698 | [2000/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9951974 | Date: | 14.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0987544 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0987544 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.10.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/327, C12Q1/00 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
C12Q1/004 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/12] | G01N27/327 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES SUBSTRATES | [2000/12] | English: | SUBSTRATE DETERMINING METHOD | [2000/12] | French: | PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION D'UN SUBSTRAT | [2000/12] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.1999 | Translation filed | 23.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.1999 | Search fee paid | 23.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 23.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]JPH08320304 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]JPH05340915 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH02310457 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH09101280 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD, et al); | [A]JPH0354447 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH06109693 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH1019832 (NOK CORP); | [A]JPH09201337 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) |