EP1044122 - DEPLOYING DIRECTION CONTROLLABLE AIRBAG STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.02.2006 [2006/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Automotive Systems Sungwoo Corporation 395-70 Shindaebang-dong, Dongjak-gu Seoul / KR | [2001/24] |
Former [2000/42] | For all designated states Sungwoo Corporation 1316-17 Seocho-dong, Secho-ku Seoul 137-070 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Byung-Hun DaeRim Apt.103-1205, Eung Bong-dong, Sungdong-ku Seoul 133-080 / KR | 02 /
JANG, Myun-Reun GaYa Apt.511-1001, SanBon-dong Kunpo-si, KyoungGi-do 435-040 / KR | [2000/42] | Representative(s) | McDonough, Jonathan, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | McDonough, Jonathan, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2000/42] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, Dr., et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA West Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 99910854.1 | 27.03.1999 | [2000/42] | WO1999KR00149 | Priority number, date | KR19980037860 | 14.09.1998 Original published format: KR 9837860 | KR19980037861 | 14.09.1998 Original published format: KR 9837861 | [2000/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0015472 | Date: | 23.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1044122 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1044122 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 23.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/22 | [2000/42] | CPC: |
B60R21/233 (EP);
B60R21/2338 (EP);
B60R2021/23324 (EP);
B60R2021/23382 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/42] | Title | German: | ENTFALTBARER GASSACK MIT RICHTUNGSKONTROLLE | [2000/42] | English: | DEPLOYING DIRECTION CONTROLLABLE AIRBAG STRUCTURE | [2000/42] | French: | DEPLOIEMENT D'UNE STRUCTURE DE COUSSIN GONFLABLE DE SECURITE ORIENTABLE | [2000/42] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.1999 | Search fee paid | 19.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/42] | 07.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/05] | Request for further processing for: | 09.03.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 09.03.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.03.2004 | Decision despatched | 30.01.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 30.01.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.02.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5306043 ; | [A]GB2283464 ; | [A]US5513877 | Examination | EP0878358 | EP1107884 |